EP3980604 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DRYING A WATER DAMAGED FLOOR STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reddo Floor Solutions AB Box 5332 102 47 Stockholm / SE | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÅHSBERG, Johan Gårdsvägen 1 474 70 Mollösund / SE | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/15] | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Drottninggatan 27 103 59 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 20822586.2 | 08.06.2020 | [2022/15] | WO2020SE50572 | Priority number, date | SE20190050688 | 10.06.2019 Original published format: SE 1950688 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020251450 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3980604 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/70, E04G23/02 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
E04B1/7015 (EP,SE,US);
E04B1/7092 (EP,SE,US);
E04G23/0285 (SE,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TROCKNEN EINER WASSERGESCHÄDIGTEN BODENSTRUKTUR | [2022/15] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DRYING A WATER DAMAGED FLOOR STRUCTURE | [2022/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT PERMETTANT DE SÉCHER UNE STRUCTURE DE SOL ENDOMMAGÉE PAR L'EAU | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 03.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 19.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH062375 (IG TECH RES INC) [Y] 5,12,14 * Translation; paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0027]; figure - *; | [XAYI]DE19914846 (DOERLE ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0015]; figure - * [A] 6 [Y] 2,3,5 [I] 4; | [XAYI]US2003054753 (STENEBY BENGT [SE], et al) [X] 7,15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0068]; figure - * [A] 13 [Y] 8-10,12,14,16,17 [I] 11; | [Y]US2005257394 (CLAESSON KNUT [SE]) [Y] 16,17* paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0098]; figure - *; | [Y]CA2581646 (DRYAIR INC [CA]) [Y] 2,3,8-10 * page 6, line 9 - page 10, line 17; figure - * | International search | [A]WO8401794 (KULLBERG BENGT GUSTAV ADOLF E [SE]) [A] 1-18 * ; abstract; page 1, line 1 - line 6; page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 16; claims 1,8 *; | [A]DE3306044 (GETRO GEBAEUDETROCKNUNGS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * ; abstract; page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 9; page 5, line 31 - page 6, line 4; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9845653 (POHJOIS SUOMEN KUIVAUSTEKNIKKA [FI], et al) [A] 1-18* ; abstract; all figures *; | [A]DE19721795 (MUNTERS TROCKNUNGS SERVICE GMB [DE]) [A] 1-18 * ; abstract; figure 1 *; | [A]US2005066537 (KAHNER ALFRED A [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0029], [0032], [0044]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2005047792 (ALMOG MEIR [IL]) [A] 1-18 * ; abstract; all figures *; | [A]SE1630308 (REDDO FLOOR SOLUTIONS AB [SE]) [A] 1-18 * ; abstract; page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 2; all figures; claims 8-9 * |