EP3984091 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AQUEOUS RECOVERY OF LEAD FROM LEAD ACID BATTERIES WITH REDUCED ELECTROLYTE DEMAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aqua Metals Inc. 5370 Kietzke Ln no 201 Reno, NV 89511 / US | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/16] | For all designated states Aqua Metals Inc. 2500 Peru Drive McCarran, Nevada 89434 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOHANTA, Samaresh 6546 Windward Ridge Way San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
HUFFORD, Joshua 2500 Peru Drive McCarran, Nevada 89434 / US | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/16] | Kador & Partner PartG mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20823203.3 | 12.06.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020US37539 | Priority number, date | US201962860928P | 13.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962860928 P | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020252343 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3984091 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/54, C22B3/00 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
H01M10/06 (EP,KR);
H01M10/54 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22B13/045 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C25C1/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C01G21/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22B1/005 (EP,KR,US);
C22B1/02 (EP,CN,KR);
C22B1/11 (US);
C25C7/007 (EP,CN,KR);
H01M4/56 (EP,KR);
Y02P10/20 (EP,KR);
Y02P20/129 (EP);
Y02W30/84 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR WÄSSRIGEN RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON BLEI AUS BLEISÄUREBATTERIEN MIT REDUZIERTEM ELEKTROLYTBEDARF | [2022/16] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AQUEOUS RECOVERY OF LEAD FROM LEAD ACID BATTERIES WITH REDUCED ELECTROLYTE DEMAND | [2022/16] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR RÉCUPÉRATION AQUEUSE DE PLOMB DE BATTERIES AU PLOMB-ACIDE À DEMANDE D'ÉLECTROLYTE RÉDUITE | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 27.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4118219 (ELMORE MARION EDWARD, et al); | International search | [A]WO2017096209 (AQUA METALS INC [US]); | [A]CN107268028 (UNIV XIANGTAN); | [A]CN109763143 (UNIV HUAZHONG SCIENCE TECH); |