EP3982994 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF RESPIRATORY SYNCYTIAL VIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIDARA THERAPEUTICS, INC. 6310 Nancy Ridge Drive Suite 101 San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORCHARDT, Allen 5419 Via Carancho San Diego, CA 92111 / US | 02 /
BRADY, Thomas, P. 7561 Windsong Road San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Zhi-Yong 8344 Via Sonoma Unit D La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 04 /
DO, Quyen-Quyen, Thuy 10414 Rosedust Glen Drive San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 05 /
HAUSSENER, Travis, James 3971 Ecochee Ave San Diego, CA 92117 / US | 06 /
NONCOVICH, Alain 8420 via Mallorca, Unit 103 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 07 /
TARI, Leslie, W. 781 S Nardo Ave Apt O-18 Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 20823466.6 | 12.06.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020US37606 | Priority number, date | US201962861127P | 13.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962861127 P | US201962897964P | 09.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962897964 P | US202062959772P | 10.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062959772 P | US202062970506P | 05.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062970506 P | US202062994203P | 24.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062994203 P | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020252396 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3982994 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, A61K31/41, A61K31/437, A61K31/519, A61P31/14, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, C07K16/10 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61K47/6811 (US);
A61K31/41 (EP);
A61K31/437 (EP);
A61K31/519 (EP);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/545 (US);
A61K47/68 (EP);
C07K16/1027 (EP);
C07K7/06 (EP);
C07K7/08 (EP);
C07K2317/53 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/16] | A61K38/04, A61K38/12, A61K38/14, C07K7/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DES RESPIRATORISCHEN SYNCYTIALVIRUS | [2022/16] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF RESPIRATORY SYNCYTIAL VIRUS | [2022/16] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU VIRUS RESPIRATOIRE SYNCYTIAL | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 04.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO9938508 (VIROPHARMA INC [US], et al) [I] 1,2,6,10-15 * page 2, lines 25-27, claims and examples *[A] 3-5,7-9; | [A]WO2014060411 (JANSSEN R & D IRELAND [IE]) [A] 1-15 * examples and claims *; | [A]WO2015158653 (JANSSEN SCIENCES IRELAND UC [IE]) [A] 1-15 * examples and claims *; | [A] - TENG-FEI ZHAO ET AL, "Multivalent zanamivir-bovine serum albumin conjugate as a potent influenza neuraminidase inhibitor", JOURNAL OF CARBOHYDRATE CHEMISTRY, UK, (20170613), vol. 36, no. 4-6, doi:10.1080/07328303.2017.1390577, ISSN 0732-8303, pages 235 - 246, XP055691867 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/07328303.2017.1390577 | International search | [A]US2009041791 (FENG BAINIAN [US]) [A] 1-43, 44/26-43, 54-95, 96/78-95, 109-110* ; paragraph [0007] *; | [A]US2012009205 (GEGG COLIN V [US], et al) [A] 1-43, 44/26-43, 54-95, 96/78-95, 109-110 * ; paragraph [0111] *; | [A]US2015218258 (FRANCIS MATTHEW B [US], et al) [A] 1-43, 44/26-43, 54-95, 96/78-95, 109-110 * ; paragraphs [0042]-[0043], [0096] *; | [A]WO2018006063 (CIDARA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-43, 44/26-43, 54-95, 96/78-95, 109-110 * ; page 1, lines 31-37 *; | [A]WO2018128826 (CIDARA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-43, 44/26-43, 54-95, 96/78-95, 109-110 * ; page 1, lines 27-30; page. 2, lines 3-7 . * |