EP4078048 - HEAT EXCHANGER AND ADSORPTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fahrenheit GmbH Zscherbener Landstraße 17 06126 Halle / Saale / DE | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PISCHEL, Rainer Merkur-Strasse 56 06118 Halle / DE | 02 /
HERRMANN, Ralph Kabelstrasse 6c 06118 Halle / DE | 03 /
MITTELBACH, Walter Schneeburgstrasse 18c 79111 Freiburg / DE | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | Werhahn, Jasper Carl Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB P.O. Box 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20824920.1 | 10.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP85594 | Priority number, date | DE201910134587 | 16.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019134587 | [2022/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021122327 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4078048 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F25B17/08, F25B37/00, F28F1/12, B01J20/00, F28D21/00, F28F13/00, F28F13/18 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
F28F1/12 (EP,KR,US);
F28F13/185 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/3204 (EP,KR);
B01J20/3236 (EP,KR);
B01J20/3238 (EP,KR);
F25B17/08 (EP,KR,US);
F25B37/00 (EP,KR);
F28D21/00 (KR);
F28F13/003 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | WÄRMEÜBERTRAGER UND ADSORPTIONSMASCHINE | [2022/43] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER AND ADSORPTION MACHINE | [2022/43] | French: | ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ET MACHINE D'ADSORPTION | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 04.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE3016290 (WALLSTEN HANS IVAR) [X] 1,3,5,12,14,15 * page 23 - page 25; figures 5,6,7 * [I] 2,4,6-11,13; | [A]EP1748259 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2015104719 (BRY AIR ASIA PVT LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * page 7, line 15 - page 22, lines 13,19; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2016084541 (AGUADO SONIA SIERRA [ES], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0137] *; | [A] - Andreas Hauer, "Beurteilung fester Adsorbentien in offenen Sorptionssystemen f?r energetische Anwendungen", Beurteilung fester Adsorbentien in offenen Sorptionssystemen für energetische Anwendungen, (20020101), page 83, XP055147622 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1761657 |