EP3987146 - PIPE COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McMillan, Jaron Lyell 6-199 Cossars Road Rd 2, Tai Tapu Christchurch 7672 / NZ | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20825128.0 | 11.06.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020IB55506 | Priority number, date | NZ20190197547 | 19.06.2019 Original published format: NZ 19754719 | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020254926 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3987146 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/046, F16L21/08 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
F16L21/08 (EP,AU);
E21B17/0465 (EP,AU);
F16L21/002 (US);
F16L25/10 (AU)
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | E21B17/046 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | ROHRKUPPLUNG | [2022/17] | English: | PIPE COUPLING | [2022/17] | French: | RACCORD DE TUYAUTERIE | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 19.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2165827 (BADE & CO GMBH) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US3863959 (BLASCHKE KURT KARL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]DE3942030 (FROMME THEO [DE]) [I] 1-15 * column 1, line 21 - column 4, line 46; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2007254516 (STOETZER ERWIN [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [X]DE3942030 (FROMME THEO [DE]) [X] 1-13, 15, 17, 20-21 * figs 1-4, column 1 lines 10-11 & 56-61, column 2 lines 8-61, column 4 lines 38-41 & 47-57 *; | [A]US2007254516 (STOETZER ERWIN [DE]) [A] 0 * figs 1-4 *; | [A]US9995087 (QUEEN FRANKIE A R [US]) [A] 0* figs 4-7, 28-31 * |