EP3983130 - GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sola, Serge 14a Williamson Road Ingleburn NSW 2565 / AU | For all designated states Decorte, David 14a Williamson Road Ingleburn NSW 2565 / AU | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Handsome I.P. Ltd 27-28 Monmouth Street Bath BA1 2AP / GB | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 20825828.5 | 16.06.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020AU50605 | Priority number, date | AU20190902089 | 17.06.2019 Original published format: AU 2019902089 | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020252521 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3983130 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/28, B05B7/26, B05B16/00 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
B01D53/18 (EP,IL,US);
B01F25/4231 (AU,US);
B01F23/21322 (US);
B05B7/0012 (EP,IL);
B05B7/04 (US);
B05B7/0416 (AU,IL);
B05B7/2416 (EP);
B05B7/2424 (AU,IL,US);
B05B7/26 (AU,IL);
B05B7/267 (IL,US);
B05D1/02 (AU,IL,US);
B01D2257/708 (EP,IL,US);
B01D2258/0258 (EP,IL);
B01D2258/06 (EP,IL,US);
B01F2101/2305 (AU,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/16] | B05B1/28, B05B7/26, B05B16/00, B01F5/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | GASBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2022/16] | English: | GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2022/16] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 06.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]USRE24291E (EVANSTON GODYER) [X] 1,14 * the whole document * [I] 2-13,15; | [XI]US3243014 (ERIK BJORKLUND GUSTAF) [X] 1,14 * the whole document *[I] 2-13,15; | [XI]EP3134137 (PROLITEC INC [US]) [X] 1-8,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 9-13 | International search | [A]US2007062444 (SHUTIC JEFFREY R [US], et al) [A] 0; | [X]US2015297775 (ANSLEY MATTHEW [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 11, 13, 19 * Abstract; Fig. 2; para [0022] *; | [A]US2018092762 (TAYLOR CHARLES DOUGLAS [US], et al)[A] 0; | [X]CN207325136U (GUANGZHOU BIAOGU ADVERTISING CO LTD) [X] 1-20 * Abstract; Fig. 1 *; | [X]CN108525966 (HAINING QIANGSHENG BULB CO LTD) [X] 1-9, 10-11, 13, 16, 19-20 * Abstract; Fig. 2 * | by applicant | US3243014 | EP3134137 |