EP3983158 - HOLE-SAW WITH BRAZED OR WELDED ENDCAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation 13135 West Lisbon Road Brookfield, WI 53005 / US | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKSIMOVIC, Hannah T. 10433 South Justin Drive Oak Creek, Winsconsin 53154 / US | 02 /
SCHULZ, Andrw 1925 Highland Court Slinger, Winsconsin 53086 / US | 03 /
MOHR, John P. 4306 Cedar Creek Road Slinger, Winsconsin 53086 / US | 04 /
NORTH, Jesse R. 2180 North 58th Street Milwaukee, Winsconsin 53208 / US | 05 /
SIGNER, Timothy J. 112 North Washington Avenue Waukesha, Winsconsin 53188 / US | 06 /
ENGEL, Bradley Charles 5116 Plateau Court Waterford, Winsconsin 53185 / US | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/16] | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex/ Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 20826559.5 | 16.06.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020US37875 | Priority number, date | US201962862483P | 17.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962862483 P | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020257157 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3983158 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/04 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
B23B51/0473 (EP,US);
B23B51/04 (CN);
B23B2240/08 (EP);
B23B2240/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/16] | B23B47/28, B23B51/04, B23D61/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | LOCHSÄGE MIT GELÖTETER ODER GESCHWEISSTER ENDKAPPE | [2022/16] | English: | HOLE-SAW WITH BRAZED OR WELDED ENDCAP | [2022/16] | French: | SCIE-CLOCHE AVEC EMBOUT BRASÉ OU SOUDÉ | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3999619 (WATSON JOHN V); | [XI]US4072441 (LAPOINTE GABRIEL M); | [X]DE10032966 (NEUDECKER & JOLITZ GMBH & CO [DE]) | International search | [AX]US4072441 (LAPOINTE GABRIEL M); | [A]JP2002120218 (ICHIKAWA SEIKI KK); | [A]KR100558308B ; | [A]US2016059322 (BRESLAW SETH [US], et al); | [A]US9682431 (SPERA THOMAS J [US]) |