EP3988029 - ULTRASONIC SENSOR ARRAY, GUIDE WIRE, GUIDE WIRE SYSTEM, AND CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI INTECC CO., LTD. 3-100, Akatsuki-cho Seto-shi, Aichi 489-0071 / JP | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYAMA Tsuyoshi c/o ASAHI INTECC CO., LTD., 3-100, Akatsuki-cho Seto-shi, Aichi 489-0071 / JP | 02 /
KATO Kenta c/o ASAHI INTECC CO., LTD., 3-100, Akatsuki-cho Seto-shi, Aichi 489-0071 / JP | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20827258.3 | 28.04.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020JP18061 | Priority number, date | JP20190115293 | 21.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019115293 | [2022/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020255566 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3988029 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/06, G01H11/08, A61M25/09, A61B8/00, A61B8/12, H04R17/00 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B8/445 (EP,US);
A61B8/54 (EP,US);
A61B8/56 (EP,US);
B06B1/0607 (US);
B06B1/0622 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | A61B8/12, H04R17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLSENSOR-ARRAY, FÜHRUNGSDRAHT, FÜHRUNGSDRAHTSYSTEM UND KATHETER | [2022/17] | English: | ULTRASONIC SENSOR ARRAY, GUIDE WIRE, GUIDE WIRE SYSTEM, AND CATHETER | [2022/17] | French: | RÉSEAU DE CAPTEURS ULTRASONORES, FIL-GUIDE, SYSTÈME DE FIL-GUIDE, ET CATHÉTER | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2021 | Translation filed | 26.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 12.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2001309497 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [XAY]US2006103265 (MIYOSHI TETSU [JP]); | [A]US2014236017 (DEGERTEKIN F LEVENT [US], et al); | [Y]US2015297097 (MATSUBARA BRADLEY S [US], et al); | International search | [A]JPH03155842 (YOKOGAWA MEDICAL SYST); | [A]JPH03205040 (KAADEIOMETORITSUKUSU INC); | [A]JPH0928710 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JP2001517523 ; | [YA]JP2001309497 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [XYA]JP2006158939 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]JP2012110699 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]JP2014094111 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2014161707 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]US2015297097 (MATSUBARA BRADLEY S [US], et al); | [YA]JP2016516459 ; | by applicant | JPH03205040 | JPH08112289 |