EP4096938 - MOTORCYCLE TYRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILCOT, Florian MANUFACTURE FRANCAISE DES PNEUMATIQUES MICHELIN DCJ/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 CLERMONT-FERRAND Cedex 9 / FR | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | M.F.P. Michelin DCJ/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/49] | Desbordes, Guillaume Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux DCJ/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20828049.5 | 03.12.2020 | [2022/49] | WO2020FR52271 | Priority number, date | FR20200000876 | 29.01.2020 Original published format: FR 2000876 | [2022/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021152223 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4096938 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/04, B60C9/20 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
B60C9/04 (EP);
B60C2009/2016 (EP);
B60C2009/2019 (EP);
B60C2009/2022 (EP);
B60C2200/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | MOTORRADREIFEN | [2022/49] | English: | MOTORCYCLE TYRE | [2022/49] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE POUR MOTOCYLCETTE | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 29.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1992502 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0025] , [0028] *; | [A]EP2664465 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] *; | [A]EP3199377 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0033] , [0038] *; | [X]DE112017002411T (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 10* figures 1-3; claims 1, 2, 3 * | by applicant | FR1413102 | US5702548 | FR2797213 |