EP4055492 - MULTI-PASS DISTRIBUTED DATA SHUFFLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAKILIAN, Mohsen 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
AHMADI, Hossein 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 20828390.3 | 03.11.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020US58637 | Priority number, date | US201916672939 | 04.11.2019 Original published format: US201916672939 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021091849 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4055492 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/182, G06F16/27 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
G06F16/182 (EP,CN);
G06F16/278 (EP,CN);
G06F3/0644 (CN,US);
G06F12/0223 (CN,US);
G06F12/0804 (CN,US);
G06F3/0611 (CN,US);
G06F3/067 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | VERTEILTE DATENMISCHUNG MIT MEHREREN DURCHGÄNGEN | [2022/37] | English: | MULTI-PASS DISTRIBUTED DATA SHUFFLE | [2022/37] | French: | MÉLANGE DE DONNÉES DISTRIBUÉES À PASSAGES MULTIPLES | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 30.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2018196618 (AHMADI HOSSEIN [US], et al); | [XI]US10223450 (ARMSTRONG MATTHEW A [US], et al) |