EP4081920 - STEGANOGRAPHIC IMAGE ENCODING OF BIOMETRIC TEMPLATE INFORMATION ON A CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capital One Services, LLC 1680 Capital One Drive McLean, Virginia 22102 / US | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSBORN, Kevin c/o Capital One Services, LLC 1680 Capital One Drive McLean, Virginia 22102 / US | 02 /
CHIGURUPATI, Srinivasa c/o Capital One Services, LLC 1680 Capital One Drive McLean, Virginia 22102 / US | 03 /
RULE, Jeffrey c/o Capital One Services, LLC 1680 Capital One Drive McLean, Virginia 22102 / US | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/44] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20828420.8 | 24.11.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020US61937 | Priority number, date | US201916726565 | 24.12.2019 Original published format: US201916726565 | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021133501 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4081920 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/32, G06F21/34, G06F21/36, G06Q20/40 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/3278 (CN,US);
G06F21/34 (EP,KR);
G06F21/36 (EP);
G06F21/64 (KR);
G06Q20/352 (KR,US);
G06Q20/3823 (CN,US);
G06Q20/40145 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06Q20/405 (KR,US);
G06T1/005 (KR,US);
G06V40/1365 (KR,US);
H04L9/0825 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | STEGANOGRAFISCHE BILDCODIERUNG VON BIOMETRISCHEN VORLAGENINFORMATIONEN AUF EINER KARTE | [2022/44] | English: | STEGANOGRAPHIC IMAGE ENCODING OF BIOMETRIC TEMPLATE INFORMATION ON A CARD | [2022/44] | French: | CODAGE D'IMAGE STÉGANOGRAPHIQUE D'INFORMATIONS DE MODÈLE BIOMÉTRIQUE SUR UNE CARTE | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 19.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US2015294171 (GN MADHUSUDAN [IN], et al) [I] 19,20 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0053] * * figure 7 * [Y] 1-18; | [Y]US10489781 (OSBORN KEVIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 40 * * column 13, line 20 - column 14, line 30 * * column 26, line 22 - line 63 * * column 31, line 48 - column 35, line 60 ** figures 1,13,14 *; | [I] - NIKOS KOMNINOS ET AL, Protecting Biometric Templates with Image Watermarking Techniques, BIG DATA ANALYTICS IN THE SOCIAL AND UBIQUITOUS CONTEXT : 5TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MODELING SOCIAL MEDIA, MSM 2014, 5TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MINING UBIQUITOUS AND SOCIAL ENVIRONMENTS, MUSE 2014 AND FIRST INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MACHINE LE, (20070827), ISBN 978-3-642-17318-9, XP019098884 [I] 19,20 * page 115, paragraph l - page 116, paragraph 5 * |