EP4052440 - TRANSMISSION DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALK, Rainer Primelweg 9 85586 Poing / DE | 02 /
OTTO, Christina Stubaier Straße 20 81739 München / DE | 03 /
PATZLAFF, Heiko Georgenstraße 76 80799 München / DE | 04 /
WIMMER, Martin Mozartstr. 53a 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 20828978.5 | 10.12.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020EP85508 | Priority number, date | DE201910220246 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019220246 | [2022/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021122298 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4052440 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04L12/24 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H04L63/0209 (EP,US);
H04L41/145 (EP);
H04L63/1433 (EP);
H04L63/1441 (US);
H04L67/08 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN VON DATEN | [2022/36] | English: | TRANSMISSION DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA | [2022/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION POUR LA TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 01.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004028107 (KAEMPER PETER [DE]) [A] 1-14 * pages 7,8,13 *; | [A]DE102010054093 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A]EP2905229 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0073] ** paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0095] *; | [XI]EP3293941 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US]) [X] 1-6,8-10,13,14 * figures 5-7 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0085] * [I] 7,11,12 |