EP4078397 - LINKING INDIVIDUAL DATASETS TO A DATABASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ancestry.com DNA, LLC 1300 W. Traverse Parkway Lehi, UT 84043 / US | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Shiya Ancestry.com DNA, LLC 1300 W. Traverse Parkway Lehi, Utah 84043 / US | 02 /
PEI, Jingwen Ancestry.com DNA, LLC 1300 W. Traverse Parkway Lehi, Utah 84043 / US | 03 /
JORGENSEN, Brett Frederick Ancestry.com DNA, LLC 1300 W. Traverse Parkway Lehi, Utah 84043 / US | 04 /
STERN, Aaron James Ancestry.com DNA, LLC 1300 W. Traverse Parkway Lehi, Utah 84043 / US | 05 /
CURTIS, Ross E. Ancestry.com DNA, LLC 1300 W. Traverse Parkway Lehi, Utah 84043 / US | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20829028.8 | 19.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020IB62256 | Priority number, date | US201962951646P | 20.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962951646 P | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021124298 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4078397 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/2455 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
G06F16/24564 (EP);
G06F16/24558 (US);
G06F16/2246 (US);
G06F16/24578 (US);
G16B10/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | VERKNÜPFUNG EINZELNER DATENSÄTZE MIT EINER DATENBANK | [2022/43] | English: | LINKING INDIVIDUAL DATASETS TO A DATABASE | [2022/43] | French: | LIAISON DE JEUX DE DONNÉES INDIVIDUELS À UNE BASE DE DONNÉES | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 20.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2016070859 (IGNATENKO TANYA [NL]) [I] 1-20* abstract * |