EP4065811 - IMPROVED TOOL FOR REMEDIAL OF LOST CIRCULATION WHILE DRILLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOPI AS Stiklestadveien 3 7041 Trondheim / NO | [2023/39] |
Former [2022/40] | For all designated states PRORES AS P.O. Box 5792 Torgard 7437 Trondheim / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABDOLLAHI, Jafar Brøsetveien 182B 7050 Trondheim / NO | 02 /
CARLSEN, Inge Manfred Væretrøa 167 7055 Ranheim / NO | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Acapo AS Edvard Griegs vei 1 5059 Bergen / NO | [2024/01] |
Former [2022/40] | Acapo AS P.O. Box 1880 Nordnes 5817 Bergen / NO | Application number, filing date | 20829038.7 | 30.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020NO50295 | Priority number, date | NO20190001415 | 28.11.2019 Original published format: NO 20191415 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021107786 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4065811 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4065811 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E21B21/00, E21B27/02 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
E21B21/003 (EP,GB,NO,US);
E21B21/10 (NO);
E21B21/103 (US);
E21B27/02 (EP,GB);
E21B33/138 (NO);
E21B34/063 (US);
E21B34/142 (US);
E21B47/00 (US);
E21B2200/06 (US);
E21B47/12 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] |
Former [2022/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES WERKZEUG ZUR BEHEBUNG VON SPÜLVERLUST WÄHREND DES BOHRENS | [2022/40] | English: | IMPROVED TOOL FOR REMEDIAL OF LOST CIRCULATION WHILE DRILLING | [2022/40] | French: | OUTIL AMÉLIORÉ POUR REMÉDIER À UNE CIRCULATION DE PERTE PENDANT UN FORAGE | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 28.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 03.01.2024 | |
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3255833 (KERR PAUL F) [A] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0066878 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-37* the whole document *; | [A]EP1653042 (SCHLUMBERGER SERVICES PETROL [FR], et al) [A] 1-37 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1653942 | US2007246225 | NO20180753 |