EP4078950 - FILM GRAIN PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SJÖBERG, Rickard Sankt Eriksgatan 84 113 62 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
SAFFAR, Davood Nybodagatan 12, lgh 1504 17142 Solna / SE | 03 /
PETTERSSON, Martin Stenvallavägen 10 186 34 Vallentuna / SE | 04 /
DAMGHANIAN, Mitra Markörvägen 3 19792 Upplands-Bro / SE | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20829554.3 | 11.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP85743 | Priority number, date | US201962950554P | 19.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962950554 P | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021122367 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4078950 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/117, H04N19/172, H04N19/174, H04N19/70, H04N19/85 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
H04N19/117 (EP);
H04N19/85 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/174 (EP,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | FILMKORNVERFAHREN | [2022/43] | English: | FILM GRAIN PROCESS | [2022/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GRAIN DE FILM | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 18.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2015009628 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-28 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [107] - pages 35,37 *; | [X]WO2019040663 (NETFLIX INC [US]) [X] 1,2,11,17-28 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0067] * * figures 1,3 *; | [XAI] - Peter De Rivay ET AL, "AV1 Bitstream & Decoding Process Specification Codec Working Group Chair Adrian Grange, Google LLC Document Design", (20190108), URL: https://aomediacodec.github.io/av1-spec/av1-spec.pdf, (20200915), XP055730685 [X] 1-5,10-12,14,17-28 * sections 5.9.2, 5.9.30, 6.8.20, 7.18.3 * [A] 8,9,16 [I] 6,7,13,15 | [XAI] - NORKIN ANDREY ET AL, "Film Grain Synthesis for AV1 Video Codec", 2018 DATA COMPRESSION CONFERENCE, IEEE, (20180327), doi:10.1109/DCC.2018.00008, pages 3 - 12, XP033376037 [X] 1-5,11-14,17-28 * abstract * * sections 1, 2, and 5* [A] 8,9,16 [I] 6,7,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DCC.2018.00008 | [XD] - BOYCE J ET AL, "Video usability information and supplemental enhancement information for coded video bitstreams (Draft 2)", no. JVET-P2007 ; m51518, (20191115), 16. JVET MEETING; 20191001 - 20191011; GENEVA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/16_Geneva/wg11/JVET-P2007-v3.zip JVET-P2007-v3.docx, (20191115), XP030224335 [XD] 1,2,11,17-28 * section 8.4 * | [A] - BROSS B ET AL, "Versatile Video Coding (Draft 7)", no. JVET-P2001 ; m51515, (20191114), 16. JVET MEETING; 20191001 - 20191011; GENEVA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/16_Geneva/wg11/JVET-P2001-v14.zip JVET-P2001-vE.docx, (20191114), XP030224330 [A] 1-28 * sections 3.5, 7.3.2.5 and 7.4.3.5 * | [XP] - SJÖBERG (ERICSSON) R ET AL, "Mandatory film grain", no. JVET-Q0424 ; m52019, (20191231), 17. JVET MEETING; 20200107 - 20200117; BRUSSELS; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/17_Brussels/wg11/JVET-Q0424-v1.zip JVET-Q0424-v1.docx, (20191231), XP030223466 [XP] 1-24 * the whole document * |