EP4077205 - FUEL DISPENSER WITH CONTROL SYSTEM INSIDE THE HYDRAULIC COMPARTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dover Fueling Solutions UK Limited Exchange Tower 19 Canning Street Edinburgh, EH3 8EH / GB | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSSON, Bengt I Tingaröd 119 274 53 SKIVARP / SE | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20829842.2 | 14.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP85952 | Priority number, date | SE20190051525 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: SE 1951525 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021122445 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4077205 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B67D7/08, B67D7/16, B67D7/32, B67D7/36, B67D7/62, B67D7/84, B67D7/04 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B67D7/08 (EP);
B67D7/04 (EP,SE,US);
B67D7/16 (EP,US);
B67D7/32 (EP);
B67D7/36 (EP);
B67D7/58 (SE);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFABGABEVORRICHTUNG MIT STEUERSYSTEM IM INNEREN DES HYDRAULIKRAUMS | [2022/43] | English: | FUEL DISPENSER WITH CONTROL SYSTEM INSIDE THE HYDRAULIC COMPARTMENT | [2022/43] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE CARBURANT AVEC SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE À L'INTÉRIEUR DU COMPARTIMENT HYDRAULIQUE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 01.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1932802 (DRESSER WAYNE AB [SE]) [Y] 1,8-10,12-14 * paragraphs [0022] , [ 0023] *; | [A]US2018009651 (PAYNE EDWARD ASBELL [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0034] *; | [Y]US2018209940 (CARAPELLI GIOVANNI [US], et al) [Y] 1,8-10,12-14 * paragraphs [0034] , [ 0043] , [ 0045] - [0048] - [ 0057] , [ 0060] * | by applicant | EP1333007 |