EP3991311 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DOWNLINK AND UPLINK MULTI-BEAM OPERATION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 04.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAHMAN, Md. Saifur 665 Clyde Ave. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
ONGGOSANUSI, Eko 665 Clyde Ave. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20830618.3 | 26.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020KR08401 | Priority number, date | US201962868283P | 28.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962868283 P | US202063020790P | 06.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063020790 P | US202063022305P | 08.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063022305 P | US202016902179 | 15.06.2020 Original published format: US202016902179 | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020263037 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3991311 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0408, H04B7/06, H04B17/309, H04L5/00, H04W72/12 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP,KR);
H04B7/0408 (KR);
H04W72/23 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W72/046 (CN,US);
H04B17/309 (EP);
H04B7/0617 (KR);
H04B7/0639 (EP);
H04B7/088 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0051 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04B17/318 (EP);
H04B17/336 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DOWNLINK - UND UPLINK-MEHRSTRAHLBETRIEB IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2022/18] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DOWNLINK AND UPLINK MULTI-BEAM OPERATION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2022/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR OPÉRATION MULTI-FAISCEAU EN LIAISON DESCENDANTE ET EN LIAISON MONTANTE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 01.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2019103908 (YU CHIA-HAO [TW], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0032] - [0036]; figures 3,4 *; | [X] - MEDIATEK INC, "DL and UL Beam Management", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czechia; 20171009 - 20171013, (20171008), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1718333_BEAMINDICATION_ULBM_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20171008), XP051341516 [X] 1-12 * pages 1,5,6 * | [A] - R2, "Corrections on EN-DC - CSI L1 parameters", vol. RAN WG2, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180215), 3GPP DRAFT; DRAFT CR 38331 V15.0.1 - CSI-RS V003, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Email%5FDiscussions/RAN2/[Misc]/ASN1%20review/TS%2038331%202018%2D02/A2%5FL1%2DCSI%2DMeasConfig, (20180215), XP051545825 [A] 4,5,9,10 * page 16 * | International search | [X]US2019141692 (SUBRAMANIAN SUNDAR [US], et al) [X] 1,3,8,10,14-15; | [YX] - Samsung, "Enhancements on multi-beam operations", 3GPP Draft; R1-1906969 R16 Multi-Beam, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20190503), vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, XP051709003 [Y] 2,4-7,9,11-13 [X] 1,3,8,10,14-15 | [Y] - NTT DOCOMO, INC., "Discussion on multi-beam enhancement", 3GPP Draft; R1-1906225, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20190503), vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, XP051708264 [Y] 2,4-7,9,11-13 | [A] - Ericsson, "Enhancements to multi-beam operation", 3GPP Draft; R1-1907436 Enhancements to multi-beam operation, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20190503), vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, XP051709450 [A] 1-15 | [A] - Nokia, Nokia Shanghai Bell, "Enhancements on Multi-beam Operation", 3GPP Draft; R1-1907317, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20190503), vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, Nevada, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, XP051709339 [A] 1-15 | by applicant | US2019103908 | - "E-UTRA, Physical channels and modulation;", 3GPP TS 36.211 | - "E-UTRA, Multiplexing and Channel coding;", 3GPP TS 36.212 | - "E-UTRA, Physical Layer Procedures;", 3GPP TS 36.213 | - "E-UTRA, Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification;", 3GPP TS 36.321 | - "E-UTRA, Radio Resource Control (RRC) protocol specification;", 3GPP TS 36.331 | - 3GPP TR 22.891 | - "E-UTRA, NR, Physical channels and modulation;", 3GPP TS 38.211 | - "E-UTRA, NR, Physical Layer Procedures for control;", 3GPP TS 38.213 | - "E-UTRA, NR, Physical layer procedures for data;", 3GPP TS 38.214 | - "E-UTRA, NR, Multiplexing and channel coding.", 3GPP TS 38.212 |