EP3993013 - IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Semiconductor Solutions Corporation 4-14-1, Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKA, Naoki c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, 4- 14-1, Asahicho Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Shigetaka c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, 4- 14-1, Asahicho Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | 03 /
OKAMOTO, Shintaro c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, 4- 14-1, Asahicho Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | 04 /
NAKAGAWA, Shinji c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, 4- 14-1, Asahicho Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20831192.8 | 25.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020JP25104 | Priority number, date | JP20190119045 | 26.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019119045 | [2022/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020262559 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993013 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H01L27/14634 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N23/54 (EP,CN);
H01L27/14603 (US);
H01L27/14605 (EP,CN);
H01L27/14609 (KR);
H01L27/14612 (CN);
H01L27/14614 (EP);
H01L27/1463 (CN);
H01L27/14636 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L27/14641 (EP);
H01L27/14665 (KR);
H01L27/1469 (US);
H04N13/243 (CN);
H04N23/60 (EP);
H04N23/90 (CN);
H04N25/778 (EP);
H04N25/78 (EP);
H04N25/79 (EP,US);
H01L27/14689 (US);
H04N25/60 (US);
H04N25/745 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | H01L21/3205, H01L21/768, H01L23/522, H01L27/146, H04N5/369, H04N5/374, H04N5/3745 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/18] | English: | IMAGING DEVICE | [2022/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2021 | Translation filed | 19.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 23.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6087275 (NGO MINH VAN [US], et al); | [XYI]WO2011077709 (CANON KK [JP], et al); | [Y]US2018138224 (HANEDA MASAKI [JP]); | [Y]US2019057997 (TOGASHI HIDEAKI [JP], et al); | [A]JP2019075515 (SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORP); | US2020357723 [ ] (SHOHJI REIJIROH [JP]) | International search | [XYA]JP2011138841 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2016219660 (SONY CORP); | [Y]WO2017138197 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]JP2019075515 (SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORP) | by applicant | JP2010245506 | JP2019119045 |