EP3991542 - HARVESTER, SYSTEM, PROGRAM, RECORDING MEDIUM, AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kubota Corporation 2-47, Shikitsuhigashi 1-chome Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5568601 / JP | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE Toshiki c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION, Sakai Seizosho, 64, Ishizukitamachi, Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 5900823 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHI Sotaro c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION, Sakai Seizosho, 64, Ishizukitamachi, Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 5900823 / JP | 03 /
NAKABAYASHI Takashi c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION, Sakai Seizosho, 64, Ishizukitamachi, Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 5900823 / JP | 04 /
SAKO Kazushi c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION, Sakai Seizosho, 64, Ishizukitamachi, Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 5900823 / JP | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20832073.9 | 25.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020JP24937 | Priority number, date | JP20190121783 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019121783 | JP20190121784 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019121784 | JP20190121785 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019121785 | JP20190121786 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019121786 | [2022/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020262508 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3991542 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01D67/02, A01D69/00, A01D41/127, H04N7/18 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
A01D41/127 (EP);
A01D41/00 (CN);
B60R1/23 (US);
A01D41/12 (CN);
A01D41/1252 (CN);
A01D41/1278 (CN,US);
B60R11/04 (US);
G05D1/0278 (US);
G05D1/248 (US);
H04N7/181 (EP,CN);
B60R2011/004 (US);
B60R2300/105 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | A01D67/02, A01D69/00, A01D41/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | ERNTEMASCHINE, SYSTEM, PROGRAMM, AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND VERFAHREN | [2022/18] | English: | HARVESTER, SYSTEM, PROGRAM, RECORDING MEDIUM, AND METHOD | [2022/18] | French: | MOISSONNEUSE, SYSTÈME, PROGRAMME, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT, ET PROCÉDÉ | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2021 | Translation filed | 02.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 28.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2008005711 (KUBOTA KK); | [Y]EP1614340 (KEMPER GMBH MASCHF [DE]); | [Y]JP2014171457 (YANMAR CO LTD); | [XYI]JP2015104376 (YANMAR CO LTD); | [X]WO2015083322 (YANMAR CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [Y]JPS6257246B ; | [Y]JPH09238554 (KUBOTA KK); | [Y]JP2005245324 (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH); | [Y]JP4871039B ; | [Y]JP2014073136 (YANMAR CO LTD); | [A]JP5586910B ; | [Y]JP2014171457 (YANMAR CO LTD); | [XY]JP2015104376 (YANMAR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2017012040 (MITSUBISHI MAHINDRA AGRICULTURAL MACHINERY CO LTD); | [A]US2018049369 (SECREST RUSSEL S [US], et al); | [Y]JP2018121615 (KUBOTA KK); | [A]JP2018186728 (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH); | [Y]JP2019010027 (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH); | [Y]JP2019083703 (UNIV KYOTO, et al) | by applicant | JP2007183877 | JP2019004868 |