EP3992346 - FRONT-LOADING WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qingdao Haier Drum Washing Machine Co., Ltd. No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | For all designated states HAIER SMART HOME CO., LTD. No. 1, Haier Road Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Zhiqiang No.1 Haier Road, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 02 /
XU, Sheng No.1 Haier Road, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 03 /
LV, Peishi No.1 Haier Road, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 04 /
LAO, Chunfeng No.1 Haier Road, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 05 /
LI, Yimin No.1 Haier Road, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Ziebig Hengelhaupt Intellectual Property Attorneys Patentanwaltskanzlei PartGmbB Leipziger Straße 49 10117 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | Ziebig & Hengelhaupt Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Leipziger Straße 49 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 20832111.7 | 19.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020CN97065 | Priority number, date | CN201910552596 | 25.06.2019 Original published format: CN201910552596 | CN201910552434 | 25.06.2019 Original published format: CN201910552434 | [2022/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020259405 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992346 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/10, // D06F103/16, D06F103/18 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
D06F37/10 (EP);
D06F23/025 (EP);
D06F34/20 (EP);
D06F2103/16 (EP);
D06F2103/18 (EP);
D06F34/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | D06F37/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | FRONTLADERWASCHMASCHINE | [2022/18] | English: | FRONT-LOADING WASHING MACHINE | [2022/18] | French: | MACHINE À LAVER À CHARGEMENT FRONTAL | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2022 | Translation filed | 25.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 21.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/31] | 15.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2004144138 (TAKEUCHI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0311] * [Y] 4-6,8-14 [I] 7-15; | [A]US7073356 (NAKAMURA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* column 8, line 18 - column 19, line 18; figure - *; | [Y]US2006288742 (HAPKE KENYON A [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,10-14 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0073]; figure - *; | [Y]CN107268237 (QINGDAO HAIER DRUM WASHING MACHINE CO LTD) [Y] 4,8,9 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0044]; figure - * | International search | [A]JP2007307067 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]CN101805971 (NANJING LG PANDA ELECTRIC APPL) [Y] 1-20 * description paragraphs 0032-0051; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]CN107268237 (QINGDAO HAIER DRUM WASHING MACHINE CO LTD) [Y] 11-20 * description paragraphs 0022-0030; figures 1-3 *; | [A]CN206784026U (WUXI LITTLE SWAN CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN108203867 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]CN207646470U (WUXI LITTLE SWAN CO LTD) [Y] 1-20 * description paragraphs 0040-0066; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]CN208604369U (ANHUI JULONG TRANSMISSION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-20 * description paragraphs 0044-0063; figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE102017011271 (DIEHL AKO STIFTUNG GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [PY]CN109957923 (QINGDAO JIAONAN HAIER WASHING MACHINE CO LTD) [PY] 1-10 * description paragraphs 0044-0052; figures 1-8 *; | [PY]CN111088657 (QINGDAO HAIER DRUM WASHING MACHINE CO LTD) [PY] 1-10 * description paragraphs 0041-0068; figures 1-10 * |