EP3993099 - SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUBARA, Kenji c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
KAWADA, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
FUKUI, Atsushi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
TAKEUCHI, Masanobu c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20832448.3 | 16.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020JP23542 | Priority number, date | JP20190122322 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019122322 | [2022/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020262102 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993099 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3993099 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/133, H01M4/36, H01M4/587, H01M4/62, H01M4/64, H01M10/052, H01M10/0566, H01M10/0567, H01M10/0568, H01M10/0569, H01M10/36 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
H01M4/366 (EP);
H01M10/0562 (CN,US);
H01M4/583 (US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/056 (EP);
H01M10/36 (EP);
H01M4/0404 (EP);
H01M4/0428 (EP);
H01M4/133 (EP);
H01M4/1393 (EP);
H01M4/587 (EP);
H01M4/62 (EP);
H01M4/661 (EP);
H01M4/664 (EP);
H01M4/667 (EP);
H01M2004/027 (US);
H01M2300/0002 (EP,CN);
H01M2300/0068 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2022/18] | English: | SECONDARY BATTERY | [2022/18] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2021 | Translation filed | 29.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 17.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6911280 (DE JONGHE LUTGARD [US], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH11126608 (NIKKISO CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-11, paragraph [0023] *; | [A]WO2012042696 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-17* claim 1 *; | [A]JP2019021514 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-5, paragraphs [0022]-[0023] *; | [A]JP2019057359 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-9, paragraph [0020] * | by applicant | WO2016114141 | WO2017122597 | JP2018073819 | JP2018160342 |