EP3990921 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING AND DEPLETING SAMPLE INTERFERENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veravas, Inc. 3510 Hopkins Place N. Oakdale, Minnesota 55125 / US | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAINE SOLDO, Joshua c/o Veravas, Inc. 3510 Hopkins Place N. Oakdale, Minnesota 55125 / US | 02 /
DOUGLAS BERGMANN, Scott c/o Veravas, Inc. 3510 Hopkins Place N. Oakdale, Minnesota 55125 / US | 03 /
NELSON, Eric c/o Veravas, Inc. 3510 Hopkins Place N. Oakdale, Minnesota 55125 / US | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | K&L Gates LLP Friedrichstraße 110 A 10117 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | K&L Gates LLP Markgrafenstrasse 42 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 20833331.0 | 25.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020US39503 | Priority number, date | US201962866318P | 25.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962866318 P | US202063006630P | 07.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063006630 P | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020264083 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3990921 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/551, G01N33/543 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G01N33/54393 (EP,IL,US);
G01N33/54326 (EP,IL,US);
G01N33/54313 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | G01N33/547, G01N33/53, G01N33/551 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION UND VERMINDERUNG VON PROBENINTERFERENZEN | [2022/18] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING AND DEPLETING SAMPLE INTERFERENCES | [2022/18] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE DÉTECTION ET D'APPAUVRISSEMENT D'INTERFÉRENCES D'ÉCHANTILLON | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/18] | 23.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 22.04.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 22.04.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees CZ, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 23.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 23.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2022 | Decision despatched | 23.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 23.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 23.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2022 | Decision despatched | 23.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2022 | Decision despatched | 23.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.10.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2019137484 (SOLDO JOSHUA CAINE [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,12,14-20,22,25 * para 41, 59 ; examples ; claims * [I] 3,4,8-11,13,21; | [XI] - TRAMBAS C ET AL, "Depletion of biotin using streptavidin-coated microparticles: a validated solution to the problem of biotin interference in streptavidin?biotin immunoassays", ANNALS OF CLINICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, GB, (20170629), vol. 55, no. 2, doi:10.1177/0004563217707783, ISSN 0004-5632, pages 216 - 226, XP055698199 [X] 1,2,6,7,12,14-18,20,22,25 * abstract ; pg 217, col 2, para bridging pg 218 ; pg 224, col 1, para bridging col 2 ; pg 217, col 2, para 1 ; Fig 1-2 * [I] 3,4,8-11,13,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0004563217707783 | [X] - DONG HUIJIN ET AL, "Development of a Generic Anti-PEG Antibody Assay Using BioScale's Acoustic Membrane MicroParticle Technology", THE AAPS JOURNAL, SPRINGER US, NEW YORK, (20150703), vol. 17, no. 6, doi:10.1208/S12248-015-9799-4, pages 1511 - 1516, XP036000283 [X] 22-25 * pg 1512, col 2, para 2 ; Fig 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1208/s12248-015-9799-4 | [X] - POCHECHUEVA TATIANA ET AL, "PEGylation of microbead surfaces reduces unspecific antibody binding in glycan-based suspension array", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140701), vol. 412, doi:10.1016/J.JIM.2014.06.015, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 42 - 52, XP029075178 [X] 22-24 * pg 45, col 1, para 2.5.1 ; pg 46, col 2, para 2.5.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jim.2014.06.015 | [X] - MALMSTADT N ET AL, ""Smart" mobile affinity matrix for microfluidic immunoassays", LAB ON A CHIP, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, UK, (20040101), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:10.1039/B315394K, ISSN 1473-0197, pages 412 - 415, XP003013400 [X] 22-24 * Fig 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b315394k | International search | [A]US2017168047 (AGHVANYAN ANAHIT [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 8-10, 18-20 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2018292394 (SOLDO JOSHUA CAINE [US]) [A] 1-5, 8-10, 18-20* ; entire document *; | [Y]US2018348211 (UPMEIER BARBARA [DE], et al) [Y] 3-5, 8-10, 18, 20/18 * ; abstract, para [0042], [0105], [0107], [0113] *; | [XY] - TRAMBAS et al., "Depletion of biotin using streptavidin-coated microparticles: a validated solution to the problem of biotin interference in streptavidin-biotin immunoassays", Clinical Biochemistry & Laboratory Medicine, (20170629), vol. 55, doi:10.1177/0004563217707783, pages 216 - 226, XP055698199 [X] 1-2, 19, 20/19 * ; pg. 216, abstract, pg. 217, right col, para 1, 4, pg. 218, left col, para 1, pg. 219, right col, para 1 * [Y] 3-5, 8-10, 18, 20/18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0004563217707783 | [A] - Rulander Nichole Johnson, Cardamone David, Senior Marilyn, Snyder Peter J., Master Stephen R., "Interference From Anti-Streptavidin Antibody", ARCHIVES OF PATHOLOGY & LABORATORY MEDICINE, College of American Pathologists, US, US, (20130801), vol. 137, no. 8, doi:10.5858/arpa.2012-0270-CR, ISSN 0003-9985, pages 1141 - 1146, XP055779428 [A] 1-5, 8-10, 18-20 * ; entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5858/arpa.2012-0270-CR |