EP4078647 - MULTIPLE CHARGED-PARTICLE BEAM APPARATUS WITH LOW CROSSTALK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REN, Weiming 1762 Automation Pkwy San Jose, California 95131 / US | 02 /
GONG, Zizhou 1762 Automation Pkwy San Jose, California 95131 / US | 03 /
HU, Xuerang 1762 Automation Pkwy San Jose, California 95131 / US | 04 /
LIU, Xuedong 1762 Automation Pkwy San Jose, California 95131 / US | 05 /
CHEN, Zhong-wei 1762 Automation Pkwy San Jose, California 95131 / US | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20833802.0 | 17.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP86595 | Priority number, date | US201962950774P | 19.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962950774 P | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021122863 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4078647 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/28, H01J37/141, H01J37/153, H01J37/244, H01J37/29 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
H01J37/28 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01J37/3177 (IL,US);
H01J37/153 (EP,IL,KR);
H01J37/141 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01J37/1474 (IL,US);
H01J37/20 (IL,US);
H01J37/244 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01J37/292 (EP,IL,KR);
H01J2237/0435 (EP,IL,KR);
H01J2237/0453 (EP,IL,KR);
H01J2237/049 (IL,US);
H01J2237/1205 (EP,IL,KR);
H01J2237/1501 (EP,IL,KR);
H01J2237/151 (EP,IL,KR);
H01J2237/1532 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01J2237/20207 (IL,US);
H01J2237/2446 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01J2237/2448 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | LADUNGSTEILCHENSTRAHLENGERÄT MIT GERINGEM ÜBERSPRECHEN | [2022/43] | English: | MULTIPLE CHARGED-PARTICLE BEAM APPARATUS WITH LOW CROSSTALK | [2022/43] | French: | APPAREIL À FAISCEAUX DE PARTICULES CHARGÉES MULTIPLES À FAIBLE DIAPHONIE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 25.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2016284505 (REN WEIMING [US], et al) [Y] 10-14* paragraphs [0061] , [0077]; figures 2A,2B,2C,3,7,10,11A,11B *; | [XYI]US2017154756 (REN WEIMING [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0110] - [0114]; claims 4,13,24,25,35,45,52,73,74 * * figures 1-15 * [Y] 10-14 [I] 15 |