EP3994254 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR GENE REPLACEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHILDREN'S MEDICAL CENTER CORPORATION 55 Shattuck Street Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLT, Jeffrey R. c/o Children's Medical Center Corporation 55 Shattuck Street Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Impact Intellectual Property LLP 1 Sans Walk London EC1R 0LT / GB | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20834446.5 | 02.07.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020US40608 | Priority number, date | US201962870488P | 03.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962870488 P | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021003337 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3994254 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/16, C12N9/22, C12N9/78, C12N9/99 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61K48/005 (EP,US);
A01K67/0276 (EP);
A61K48/0075 (EP,US);
C12N15/102 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
A01K2217/075 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0306 (EP,US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,US);
C12N2800/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM GENAUSTAUSCH | [2022/19] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR GENE REPLACEMENT | [2022/19] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE REMPLACEMENT DE GÈNE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 17.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2017053879 (EDITAS MEDICINE INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 43, line 2, paragraph l * * page 44, line 3 ** page 139, lines 1-2, paragraph 4 *; | [X] - ROBERTSON LOUISE ET AL, "Expanding the RNA-Guided Endonuclease Toolkit for Mouse Genome Editing", THE CRISPR JOURNAL, (20181201), vol. 1, no. 6, doi:10.1089/crispr.2018.0050, ISSN 2573-1599, pages 431 - 439, XP093053593 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 432, column l * * page 432, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/crispr.2018.0050 | International search | [Y]US2017073674 (MAEDER MORGAN L [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US9758781 (SMITH RICHARD J H [US], et al) [Y] 7,10,11,18 * entire document *; | [Y]US2017321214 (ZHANG FENG [US], et al) [Y] 9, 11 * entire document *; | [Y]US2018282714 (JOUNG J KEITH [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y] - GAO Xue; Gao Xue; Tao Yong; Lamas Veronica; Huang Mingqian; Yeh Wei-Hsi; Pan Bifeng; Hu Yu-Juan; Hu Johnny; Thompson David; Shu Yilai; Li Yamin; Wang Hongyang; Yang Shiming; Xu Qiaobing; Polley Daniel; Liberman; Kong Wei-Jia; Holt Jeffrey; Chen Zheng-Yi; Liu David, "Treatment of autosomal dominant hearing loss by in vivo delivery of genome editing agents", Nature, (20171220), vol. 553, no. Iss. 7687, doi:10.1038/nature25164, pages 217 - 221, XP055776079 [Y] 5, 10, 11, 16, 17 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature25164 | [Y] - GYORGY et al., "Gene Transfer with AAV9-PHP.B Rescues Hearing in a Mouse Model of Usher Syndrome 3A and Transduces Hair Cells in a Non-human Primate", Molecular Therapy Methods & Clinical Development, (20181119), vol. 13, pages 1 - 13, XP055637659 [Y] 10, 11 * . entire document * | [PX] - GYORGY et al., "Allele-specific gene editing prevents deafness in a model of dominant progressive hearing loss", Nature Medicine, (20190703), vol. 25, no. Iss. 7, doi:10.1038/s41591-019-0500-9, pages 1123 - 1130, XP036901105 [PX] 1-20 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41591-019-0500-9 |