EP3995481 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREPARING DIESTER-BASED COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CH, IT, SI | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOO, Yeon Uk LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sung Kyu LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
SHIN, Joon Ho LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
JUN, Hyoung LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
JIN, Chan Hyu LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20834495.2 | 02.07.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020KR08686 | Priority number, date | KR20190080465 | 04.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190080465 | [2022/19] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021002708 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3995481 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3995481 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/08, C07C67/03, C07C67/52, C07C69/80, C07C67/54, B01D3/00, B01D3/06, C07C67/58, C02F1/26, B01D17/04, B01D17/12 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
C07C67/03 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C67/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D17/042 (EP);
B01D17/12 (EP);
C02F1/26 (EP,CN);
C07C67/52 (KR,US);
C07C67/54 (EP);
C07C67/58 (EP,US);
C07C69/80 (KR);
B01J2219/00051 (KR);
B01J2219/00164 (KR);
B01J2219/00177 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C07C67/03, C07C69/80 (EP);
C07C67/03, C07C69/82 (CN,EP);
C07C67/08, C07C69/80 (EP);
C07C67/08, C07C69/82 (CN,EP);
C07C67/54, C07C69/80 (EP);
C07C67/54, C07C69/82 (EP); |
Former IPC [2022/36] | C07C67/08, C07C67/03, C07C67/52, C07C69/80, C07C67/54, B01D3/00, B01D3/06, C07C67/58 | ||
Former IPC [2022/19] | C07C67/08, C07C67/03, C07C67/52, C07C69/80 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DIESTERBASIERTEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2022/19] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREPARING DIESTER-BASED COMPOSITION | [2022/19] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE COMPOSITION À BASE DE DIESTER | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2021 | Translation filed | 30.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 13.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.04.2023 | AT | 12.04.2023 | CZ | 12.04.2023 | DK | 12.04.2023 | EE | 12.04.2023 | ES | 12.04.2023 | FI | 12.04.2023 | HR | 12.04.2023 | IT | 12.04.2023 | LT | 12.04.2023 | LV | 12.04.2023 | MC | 12.04.2023 | NL | 12.04.2023 | PL | 12.04.2023 | RO | 12.04.2023 | RS | 12.04.2023 | SE | 12.04.2023 | SI | 12.04.2023 | SK | 12.04.2023 | SM | 12.04.2023 | LU | 02.07.2023 | NO | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | IS | 12.08.2023 | PT | 14.08.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/18] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
LU | 02.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 12.04.2023 | |
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 12.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2851393 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * example 1 ** claims 1-20 *; | [AD]KR20190027623 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1-14 * | International search | [A]US2002087028 (HIRATA TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * See entire document. *; | [Y]JP2010095467 (TOAGOSEI CO LTD) [Y] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0029] and [0039]; claim 1; and figure 2. *; | [Y]JP2010189335 (TOAGOSEI CO LTD) [Y] 1-16 * See claim 1. *; | [A]US2013085288 (SNEAD THOMAS E [US], et al) [A] 1-16* See entire document. *; | [A]KR20180074984 (ENERBIO [KR]) [A] 1-16 * See entire document. *; | [DY]KR20190027623 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [DY] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0035], [0036], [0041]-[0047] and [0063]; and figure 1. * | by applicant | KR101663586B | KR20190027622 | KR20190027623 | - MUSTAFIZUR RAHMANCHRISTOPHER S. BRAZEL, "The plasticizer market: an assessment of traditional plasticizers and research trends to meet new challenges", Progress in Polymer Science, (20040000), vol. 29, doi:10.1016/J.PROGPOLYMSCI.2004.10.001, pages 1223 - 1248, XP002711921 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.PROGPOLYMSCI.2004.10.001 | - N. R. JANJUA et al., "Systemic Uptake of Diethyl Phthalate, Dibutyl Phthalate, and Butyl Paraben Following Whole-body Topical Application and Reproductive and Thyroid Hormone Levels in Humans", Environmental Science and Technology, (20080000), vol. 42, pages 7522 - 7527 | - N. R. JANJUA et al., "Systemic Uptake of Diethyl Phthalate, Dibutyl Phthalate, and Butyl Paraben Following Whole-body Topical Application and Reproductive and Thyroid Hormone Levels in Humans", Environmental Science and Technology, (20070000), vol. 41, pages 5564 - 5570 |