EP3972200 - SERVICE FLOW IDENTIFICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND MODEL GENERATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Zhengbing Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
FANG, Ping Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20834838.3 | 01.07.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020CN99614 | Priority number, date | CN201910586336 | 01.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910586336 | [2022/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021000874 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3972200 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/14, H04L43/026 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
H04L43/026 (EP);
H04L41/145 (EP,CN);
H04L41/147 (US);
H04L43/062 (CN);
H04L45/74 (US);
H04L67/61 (CN);
H04L69/22 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/12] | H04L12/26, H04L12/24, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES DIENSTFLUSSES UND VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MODELLERZEUGUNG | [2022/12] | English: | SERVICE FLOW IDENTIFICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND MODEL GENERATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2022/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'IDENTIFICATION DE FLUX DE SERVICES, ET PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION DE MODÈLE | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2021 | Translation filed | 14.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 16.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2015032883 (CHANDRASHEKAR JAIDEEP [FR]) [Y] 1,3-8 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0091] * * figures 1, 3 * [A] 2,9-15; | [YA]WO2017061895 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1,3-8 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 6 * * page 15, line 5 - page 17, line 33 * * figures 1, 2 *[A] 2,9-15 | International search | [A]CN1744573 (HANGZHOU HUAWEI SANKANG TECH [CN]) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [A]CN101695035 (CHENGDU HUAWEI SYMANTEC TECH) [A] 1-32 * description, paragraphs [0018]-[0061], and figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2016105364 (KANONAKIS KONSTANTINOS [US], et al) [A] 1-32* entire document *; | [A]US2017318082 (THAKUR BHUPINDER [IN], et al) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [A]CN108667747 (SHENZHEN INST INFORMATION TECH) [A] 1-32 * description, paragraphs [0006]-[0117], and figures 1-5 *; | [PX]CN110460488 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-32 * description, paragraphs [0004]-[0292], and figures 1-16 * |