EP3995143 - COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS, COMPRISING SNAKE VENOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AJOU UNIVERSITY INDUSTRY-ACADEMIC COOPERATION FOUNDATION 206, World cup-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-cho, 16499 / KR | [2023/10] |
Former [2022/19] | For all designated states DNBio Pharm, Inc. 1005ho, 73, Sangnam-ro Seongsan-gu Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 51504 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOHN, Seong Hyang 1702ho, 651dong, 27, Maeyeong-ro 310beon-gil, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16699 / KR | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Roos, Peter c/o Roospatent Noldinstrasse 7 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/19] | Callaghan, Dayle Anne Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20834986.0 | 26.06.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020KR08413 | Priority number, date | KR20190079560 | 02.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190079560 | KR20190079559 | 02.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190079559 | [2022/19] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021002642 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3995143 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/583, A61P29/00, A61P19/02, A23L33/10, A61K8/98, A61Q19/08 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
A61P19/02 (EP,US);
A61K38/4806 (US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A61K35/583 (EP);
A61K8/987 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61Q19/08 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | A61K35/583, A61P29/00, A61P19/02, A23L33/10, A61K8/98, A61Q19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | SCHLANGENGIFTHALTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VORBEUGUNG ODER BEHANDLUNG VON RHEUMATOIDER ARTHRITIS | [2022/19] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS, COMPRISING SNAKE VENOM | [2022/19] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR PRÉVENIR OU TRAITER LA POLYARTHRITE RHUMATOÏDE, COMPRENANT DU VENIN DE SERPENT | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2021 | Translation filed | 23.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4341762 (HAAST WILLIAM E) [X] 1-8 * examples 2, 5, 18; claims 22, 24 *; | [X]US2009209468 (REID PAUL F [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 55]; example 5; claims 1, 8, 9 *; | [X]KR101802515B (AJOU UNIV INDUSTRY-ACADEMIC COOPERATION FOUNDATION [KR]) [X] 1-8* paragraphs [0023], [0047],[0037] *; | [A] - Burbrink Burbrink Frank Frank T. T. ET AL, "Considering gene flow when using coalescent methods to delimit lineages of North American pitvipers of the genus Agkistrodon", Zoological journal of the Linnean Society, Oxford, doi:10.1111/zoj.12211, (20150201), pages 505 - 526, URL: https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/full/10.1111/zoj.12211, (20230601), XP093051136 [A] 1-8 * page 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/zoj.12211 | International search | [Y]US4341762 (HAAST WILLIAM E) [Y] 1-8 * See claims 4, 11-13 and 22-24. *; | [A]US2008279958 (REEVES WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * See entire document. *; | [X]US2009209468 (REID PAUL F [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * See paragraphs [0029] and [0055]; and claims 1 and 8-9. *; | [Y]KR101802515B (AJOU UNIV INDUSTRY-ACADEMIC COOPERATION FOUNDATION [KR]) [Y] 1-8 * See abstract; and paragraphs [0016] and [0023]-[0024]. *; | [A]CN109758480 (JINGDEZHEN CHEN FENG SPECIAL WILD ANIMAL TECH DEVELOPMENT CO LTD) [A] 1-8* See entire document. * | by applicant | KR20090036908 | JP2010075194 | KR20160118417 | KR101802515B | KR101802514B |