EP3999491 - COMPOUNDS FOR PROVIDING A LONG-LASTING FLORAL AND FRUITY ODOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERRMANN, Andreas c/o Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | 02 /
TRACHSEL, Alain c/o Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Strych, Sebastian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/21] | Strych, Sebastian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20835770.7 | 17.12.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020EP86778 | Priority number, date | EP20190218158 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: EP 19218158 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021122997 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999491 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07C317/24, C07C323/22, C11B9/00, C11D3/50 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
C11D3/507 (EP,IL);
C07C317/24 (EP,IL,US);
C11B9/0011 (EP,IL,US);
C07C323/22 (EP,IL,US);
C11B9/0015 (EP,IL);
C11B9/0034 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES LANG ANHALTENDEN BLUMIGEN UND FRUCHTIGEN GERUCHS | [2022/21] | English: | COMPOUNDS FOR PROVIDING A LONG-LASTING FLORAL AND FRUITY ODOR | [2022/21] | French: | COMPOSÉS DESTINÉS À FOURNIR UNE ODEUR FLORALE ET FRUITÉE DE LONGUE DURÉE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 18.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2492335 (CHENICEK JOSEPH A, et al); | [X]US2794050 (THOMPSON RALPH B); | [X]US3040088 (BEACHEM MICHAEL T, et al); | [I]WO03049666 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al); | [A]WO2008011742 (GIVAUDAN SA [CH], et al); | [A]WO2008142591 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al); | [XY]WO2013139766 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]); | [A]WO2016116420 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]); | [A]EP3533786 (GIVAUDAN SA [CH]); | [XPI]WO2019243369 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]); | by applicant | US4137180 | US4396670 | US5236615 | WO9734986 | EP0799885 | WO2006006003 | WO2006018964 | WO2007004166 | WO2007026307 | WO2007096790 | WO2009153695 | EP2300146 | EP2379047 | EP2579976 | WO2013068255 | WO2014029695 |