EP4264458 - AUTHENTICATING A USER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNGREN, Tommy 954 42 Södra Sunderby / SE | 02 /
ÖKVIST, Peter 973 41 Luleå / SE | 03 /
KRISTENSSON, Andreas 247 35 Södra Sandby / SE | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 20835824.2 | 21.12.2020 | [2023/43] | WO2020EP87515 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022135674 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4264458 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/31, H04W12/06, H04W12/68, H04W88/02, G06F21/36 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
G06F21/316 (EP);
G06F21/36 (EP,US);
G06F3/016 (US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F3/0488 (US);
G06F3/167 (US);
H04W12/06 (EP);
H04W12/68 (EP);
G06F2221/031 (EP);
H04W88/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG EINES BENUTZERS | [2023/43] | English: | AUTHENTICATING A USER | [2023/43] | French: | AUTHENTIFICATION D'UN UTILISATEUR | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 18.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2009313693 (ROGERS SEAN SCOTT [US]); | [I]EP3246792 (BLACKBERRY LTD [CA]) |