EP3997398 - VACUUM ADIABATIC BODY AND REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Bongjin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
NAM, Hyeunsik IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
YOUN, Deokhyun IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 04 /
BAE, Jaehyun IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Jangseok IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20836298.8 | 09.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020KR08974 | Priority number, date | KR20190082727 | 09.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190082727 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021006645 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3997398 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/02, F25D17/08, F16L59/065, F16L59/12, F25D23/04 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
F25D23/02 (EP);
F25D23/065 (KR);
F25D23/028 (CN,US);
F25D23/067 (US);
F16L59/065 (KR);
F16L59/12 (KR);
F25D11/02 (CN,US);
F25D23/021 (KR);
F25D23/06 (CN);
F25D23/063 (US);
F25D23/087 (KR,US);
F25C2400/10 (EP);
F25D2201/12 (US);
F25D2201/14 (EP,KR,US);
F25D2317/061 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | ADIABATISCHER VAKUUMKÖRPER UND KÜHLSCHRANK | [2022/19] | English: | VACUUM ADIABATIC BODY AND REFRIGERATOR | [2022/19] | French: | CORPS ADIABATIQUE SOUS VIDE ET RÉFRIGÉRATEUR | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 09.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2019024968 (JUNG WONYEONG [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraphs [0071] , [0096]; figures 1,3 *[A] 4,5; | [A]WO2019117598 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1 * figure 16 * | International search | [Y]KR19990043536 [Y] 9; | [A]JP2013002655 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al)[A] 1-20; | [Y]US2017023291 (KAL SEUNG HOON [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15; | [A]KR20170016243 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-20; | [AY]KR20190070765 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 16-20 [Y] 1-15 |