EP3998480 - BIOMARKER PANEL FOR DIAGNOSING PANCREATIC CANCER AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bertis Inc 403-ho, 4 F, 172, Dolma-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13605 / KR | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Youngsoo 31-1315, 212, Samseong-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06284 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Yoseop 203-2302, 194, Central-ro Yeonsu-gu Incheon 22003 / KR | 03 /
SON, Minsoo 402, 67, Bomun-ro 35-gil Seongbuk-gu Seoul 02861 / KR | 04 /
JANG, Jin-Young SNUH Surgery, 101, Daehak-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 03080 / KR | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20836301.0 | 09.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020KR08979 | Priority number, date | KR20190082497 | 09.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190082497 | [2022/19] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021006649 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3998480 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N30/72, G16B40/10, G06N3/02, G01N30/88 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
G01N33/57438 (EP);
G01N33/6893 (KR);
G01N33/57434 (US);
G01N30/7233 (KR,US);
G01N33/6848 (KR,US);
G06N20/10 (EP,US);
G06N3/02 (KR);
G06N3/04 (US);
G16B40/10 (KR,US);
G01N2030/8831 (KR);
G01N2560/00 (US);
G01N2800/60 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | BIOMARKERPANEL ZUR DIAGNOSE VON BAUCHSPEICHELDRÜSENKREBS UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2022/19] | English: | BIOMARKER PANEL FOR DIAGNOSING PANCREATIC CANCER AND USE THEREOF | [2022/19] | French: | PANEL DE BIOMARQUEURS POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC DU CANCER DU PANCRÉAS ET UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2022 | Translation filed | 08.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 28.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2017180735 (BIOCRYPTON INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * Tables 5A, 5, 6A, 6 and 9 * [Y] 6-10; | [E]WO2021076036 (RECCAN DIAGNOSTICS AB [SE]) [E] 1-10 * the whole document ** table 1 *; | [A] - HERREROS-VILLANUEVA MARTA ET AL, "Non-invasive biomarkers in pancreatic cancer diagnosis: what we need versus what we have", ANNALS OF TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, US, (20160401), vol. 4, no. 7, doi:10.21037/atm.2016.03.44, ISSN 2305-5839, pages 134 - 134, XP093050274 [A] 1-10 * chapter "Conventional approaches" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.21037/atm.2016.03.44 | [X] - TOSHIHIRO YONEYAMA ET AL, "Identification of IGFBP2 and IGFBP3 As Compensatory Biomarkers for CA19-9 in Early-Stage Pancreatic Cancer Using a Combination of Antibody-Based and LC-MS/MS-Based Proteomics", PLOS ONE, (20160831), vol. 11, no. 8, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0161009, pages 1 - 23, XP055623544 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * * suppl. figures * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0161009 | [XY] - CHEN JIONG ET AL, "Identification and verification of transthyretin as a potential biomarker for pancreatic ductal adenocarcinoma", vol. 139, no. 7, doi:10.1007/S00432-013-1422-4, ISSN 0171-5216, (20130701), pages 1117 - 1127, JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH AND CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL, BERLIN, DE, URL: http://link.springer.com/10.1007/s00432-013-1422-4, (20130402), XP009502172 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [Y] 6-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00432-013-1422-4 | International search | [A]KR20140002149 (SNU R&DB FOUNDATION [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See entire document. *; | [A]US2015018235 (CHAPMAN KAREN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See entire document. *; | [A]WO2015157557 (MYRIAD RBM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See entire document. *; | [AX]KR20160045547 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-18 * See abstract; and claims 1-12. * [X] 19,20; | [A]WO2016195051 (NAT CANCER CT [JP]) [A] 1-20 * See entire document. *; | [A] - Jina Ko, Baldassano Steven N., Loh Po-Ling, Kording Konrad, Litt Brian, Issadore David, "Machine learning to detect signatures of disease in liquid biopsies - a user's guide", Lab on a Chip, Royal Society of Chemistry, (20180101), vol. 18, no. 3, doi:10.1039/C7LC00955K, ISSN 1473-0197, pages 1 - 21, XP055703589 [A] 1-20 * See entire document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C7LC00955K | by applicant | US5556752 | US5599695 | US5631734 | - COLYER et al., J Chromatogr A, (19970000), vol. 781, no. 1-2, pages 271 - 6 | - PETRICOIN et al., Lancet, (20020000), vol. 359, pages 572 - 77 | - CHAN-HUI et al., Clinical Immunology, (20040000), vol. 111, pages 162 - 174 | - MONTAGNE et al., Eur J Clin Chem Clin Biochem., (19920000), vol. 30, pages 217 - 22 | - KIM et al., J Proteome Res., (20100000), vol. 9, pages 689 - 99 | - ANDERSON, L et al., Mol Cell Proteomics, (20060000), vol. 5, pages 573 - 88 | - GAASTRA, W., Enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay(ELISA), in Methods in Molecular Biology, Humana Press, (19840000), vol. 1 | - HAN, H et al., Cancer Res., (20020000), vol. 62, pages 2890 - 6 | - SCHENA et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA., (19960000), vol. 93, no. 20, pages 10614 - 9 | - SCHENA et al., Science, (19950000), vol. 270, no. 5235, pages 467 - 70 |