EP3901065 - FOLDABLE CONTAINER HAVING CORNER LOCKING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Pallet Pool Co., Ltd. 604, 63-8, Mapo-daero Mapo-gu Seoul 04157 / KR | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUH, Byong Yoon 103-304, 60, Samgae-ro Yongsan-gu Seoul 04359 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Yong Jun 105-104, 34, Sameun 3-gil, Jiksan-eup, Seobuk-gu Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do 31037 / KR | 03 /
KANG, Shin Joon 104-1501, 78-7, Gyeonggi-daero Osan-si Gyeonggi-do 18145 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Nu Ree 502, 19-7, Yeonseo-ro 11-gil Eunpyeong-gu Seoul 03413 / KR | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 20837015.5 | 08.01.2020 | [2021/43] | WO2020KR00319 | Priority number, date | KR20190082883 | 09.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190082883 | [2021/43] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021006443 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3901065 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D90/00, B65D88/52, B65D88/12 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
B65D88/522 (EP,US);
B65D90/0013 (KR);
B65D88/121 (KR);
B65D88/52 (KR);
B65D90/0026 (EP);
B65D90/008 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | FALTBARER BEHÄLTER MIT ECKVERRIEGELUNGSSTRUKTUR | [2021/43] | English: | FOLDABLE CONTAINER HAVING CORNER LOCKING STRUCTURE | [2021/43] | French: | CONTENEUR PLIABLE AYANT UNE STRUCTURE DE VERROUILLAGE DE COIN | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2021 | Translation filed | 22.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 14.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/09] | 12.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1217334 (TAYLOR CYRIL, et al) [Y] 1-5 * page 1, line 73 - page 2, line 87; figures 3,4 *; | [I]GB2039850 (SEA CONTAINERS LTD) [I] 1-5 * page 1, line 64 - page 3, line 81; figures 1-5,11-13 *; | [Y]GB2295381 (CLIVE SMITH MARTIN [GB]) [Y] 1-5* page 3, line 11 - page 9, line 28; figures 9-10D *; | [Y]DE102013100260 (HOLLAND CONTAINER INNOVATIONS B V [NL]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1a-7e * | International search | [YA]KR890000065 (HYUNDAI PRECISION CO.) [Y] 1-3 * See claims 1-2 and figures 2-9. * [A] 4-5; | [Y]JPH07309340 (SHINWA CORP KK) [Y] 1-3 * See paragraphs 10006]-[0011] and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]KR101439073B (KOREA CONTAINER POOL CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-3 * See paragraphs [003 1]-[0032] and figures 5-7a. *; | [Y]KR20100008164U (GONG GAN CHANNEL CO., LTD.) [Y] 2 * See paragraphs [0055], [0057] and [0076] and figures 2-9. *; | [A]KR20120006461U (KOREA CONTAINER POOL CO., LTD.) [A] 1-5 * See claims 1-3 and figures 1-6. *; | [PX]KR102029340B (KOREA PALLET POOL CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1-5 * See claims 1-2 and 5 and figures 1-21. (* The above document is the registered document for the application that serves as the basis for claiming priority of the present international application.) * | by applicant | KR101064803B | KR101439073B | KR101489626B |