EP3997409 - SAFETY DEVICE ARRANGEMENT FOR FIREARM WITH MAGAZINE WELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palovaara, Ilpo Valjakkotie 4 B 7 90310 Oulu / FI | [2024/13] |
Former [2022/19] | For all designated states Palovaara, Ilpo Näretie 3A 6 90650 Oulu / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab Salmisaarenaukio 1 P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20837040.3 | 07.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020FI00013 | Priority number, date | FI20190007102 | 08.07.2019 Original published format: FI 20197102 | [2022/19] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021005262 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3997409 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3997409 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F41A17/44, A47B81/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A47B81/005 (EP,FI,US);
F41A17/44 (EP,FI,US);
F41A23/005 (FI,US);
F41A23/18 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | F41A17/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR FEUERWAFFEN MIT MAGAZINSCHACHT | [2022/19] | English: | SAFETY DEVICE ARRANGEMENT FOR FIREARM WITH MAGAZINE WELL | [2022/19] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ POUR ARME À FEU À CAVITÉ DE CHARGEUR | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 01.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2123683 (STANLEY WORKS); | [A]US6256920 (OLSON DOUGLAS D [US]); | [A]US7543403 (SCHAEFER RYAN T [US]); | [A]US2017241730 (OCHOA PHILIP [US]); | [A]US2018238650 (STOCKTON CHRIS [US]) | International search | [Y]US7543403 (SCHAEFER RYAN T [US]) [Y] 2, 5, 7, 8 * abstract; column 6, lines 49-57; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2017241730 (OCHOA PHILIP [US]) [A] 1-8* abstract; figures 1-4 *; | [XY]US2018238650 (STOCKTON CHRIS [US]) [X] 1, 4 * the whole document; especially abstract; paragraphs [0021]-[0029]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 2, 5, 7, 8 |