EP3982579 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING FEEDBACK RESOURCE IN NR V2X [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Daesung LG Electronics Inc. IP Center 19, Yangjae-daero, 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Seungmin LG Electronics Inc. IP Center 19, Yangjae-daero, 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
SEO, Hanbyul LG Electronics Inc. IP Center 19, Yangjae-daero, 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20837514.7 | 22.06.2020 | [2022/15] | WO2020KR08063 | Priority number, date | KR20190083374 | 10.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190083374 | KR20190083454 | 10.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190083454 | US201962895947P | 04.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962895947 P | US201962937168P | 18.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962937168 P | [2022/15] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021006500 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3982579 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3982579 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04W4/40, H04W72/02, H04W72/04, H04L5/00 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
H04L1/1861 (EP,KR);
H04W4/40 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W72/02 (US);
H04L1/1812 (CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1858 (KR);
H04L1/1896 (EP,KR);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04L5/0055 (EP,KR);
H04W4/46 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/1263 (KR);
H04W72/20 (KR,US);
H04W72/51 (KR);
H04W72/53 (CN);
G08G1/096791 (EP);
G08G1/161 (EP);
G08G1/22 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER RÜCKKOPPLUNGSRESSOURCE IN NR-V2X | [2022/15] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING FEEDBACK RESOURCE IN NR V2X | [2022/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER UNE RESSOURCE DE RÉTROACTION V2X NR | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2022 | Translation filed | 04.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 07.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "A V2X group member discovery for groupcast communication", vol. SA WG2, no. Sapporo, Japan; 20190624 - 20190628, (20190618), pages 1 - 7, 3GPP DRAFT; S2-1907629 23287 A V2X GROUP MEMBER DISCOVERY FOR GROUPCAST COMMUNICATION_V4, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fsa/WG2%5FArch/TSGS2%5F134%5FSapporo/Docs/S2%2D1907629%2Ezip, (20190618), XP051752595 [A] 1-15 * Chapter 1 * | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Feature lead summary for agenda item 7.2.4.5 Physical layer procedures for sidelink", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, (20190516), pages 1 - 26, 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1907682 FEATURE LEAD SUMMARY OF PHY PROCEDURE IN NR SIDELINK, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F97/Docs/R1%2D1907682%2Ezip, (20190516), XP051739971 [A] 1-15 | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Design and contents of PSCCH and PSFCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Taipei; 20190121 - 20190125, (20190111), pages 1 - 9, 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1900858, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5FAH/NR%5FAH%5F1901/Docs/R1%2D1900858%2Ezip, (20190111), XP051576396 [A] 1-15 | International search | [A]WO2015152581 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-20* 91, 30 - 95, 28; 39-40 *; | [XYA] - Huawei, HiSilicon, "A V2X group member discovery for groupcast communication", 3GPP Draft; S2-1907629 23287 A V2X group member discovery for groupcast communication_v4, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20190618), vol. SA WG2, no. Sapporo, Japan; 20190624 - 20190628, pages 1 - 7, XP051752595 [X] 1-2,9,14-20 * 1 * [Y] 10-13 [A] 3-8 | [Y] - Xiaomi Communications, "On HARQ operation for 5G V2x communications", 3GPP Draft; R1-1906574, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20190502), vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, XP051708610 [Y] 10-12 * 2.2 * | [Y] - InterDigital Inc, "On Physical Layer Structure for NR V2X Sidelink", 3GPP Draft; R1-1905400, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20190412), pages 1 - 13, XP051707471 [Y] 13 * 2.4 * | [A] - Nokia, Nokia Shanghai Bell, "Discussion of physical layer structure for sidelink", 3GPP Draft; R1-1906074-Nokia-5G_V2X_NRSL-Discussion of physical layer structure for sidelink, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20190504), vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, pages 1 - 18, XP051708116 [A] 1-20 * 2 * |