EP3997267 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN ENDLESS LOOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cortland Industrial LLC 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900 Dallas, TX 75201 / US | [2024/21] |
Former [2022/19] | For all designated states Cortland Company, Inc. 10633 West Airport Blvd. Suite 300 Stafford TX 77477 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VARNAVA, Thanasis 6003 Wolforo Dr. Houston TX 77007 / US | 02 /
MURPHY, Ryan 2119 Lubbock St. Houston TX 77007 / US | 03 /
MOUMNANI, Ahmed, Tagnaouti 2250 Eldridge Parkway, Apt 1236 Houston TX 77077 / US | 04 /
CONGER, Wesley 3818 Garrott St. Houston TX 77006 / US | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/19] | Vinsome, Rex Martin Murgitroyd & Company Newcastle 3 Collingwood Street Newcastle NE1 1JW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20837556.8 | 10.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020US41557 | Priority number, date | US201962873041P | 11.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962873041 P | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021007497 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3997267 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | D07B1/02, D07B5/06, D07B7/16, B66C1/12 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
B66C1/122 (EP);
D07B7/165 (EP,US);
D07B1/025 (EP,US);
D07B1/18 (EP,US);
B66C1/18 (US);
D07B2201/1044 (EP,US);
D07B2201/2036 (EP,US);
D07B2205/2014 (EP,US);
D07B2205/2042 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
D07B2205/2014, D07B2801/10 (EP);
D07B2205/2042, D07B2801/10 (EP);
D07B2205/2046, D07B2801/10 (EP);
D07B2205/205, D07B2801/10 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ENDLOSSCHLEIFE | [2022/19] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN ENDLESS LOOP | [2022/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE BOUCLE SANS FIN | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 22.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB567406 (GOODRICH CO B F); | [I]US2009107573 (ST GERMAIN DENNIS [US]); | [XI]EP3029197 (GLEISTEIN & SOHN GMBH GEO [DE]); | [A]EP3165670 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) | International search | [A]US3786623 (ELIASSON K); | [A]US2008282664 (CHOU CHIA-TE [US], et al); | [Y]US2009108603 (ST GERMAIN GEORGE FREDERICK DENNIS [US]); | [A]WO2014043136 (SAMSON ROPE TECHNOLOGIES [US], et al); | [Y]US2015147509 (BOSMAN RIGOBERT [NL], et al) | by applicant | EP3029197 |