EP3998002 - MIRROR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHEET GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAGUCHI, Masafumi c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 02 /
OYA, Kazuaki c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 03 /
SHIMOKAWA, Yohei c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20837629.3 | 10.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020JP27116 | Priority number, date | JP20190129675 | 11.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019129675 | [2022/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021006348 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3998002 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47G1/00 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
A47G1/02 (EP,US);
G02B27/0006 (US);
G02B1/14 (EP);
G02B1/18 (EP);
G02B5/0808 (EP);
G02B5/09 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | SPIEGEL | [2022/19] | English: | MIRROR | [2022/19] | French: | MIROIR | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2021 | Translation filed | 17.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 08.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS3626752Y (-) [Y] 11 * figure 5 *; | [Y]JPS5528136Y (-) [Y] 5 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2002037402 (YAMAZAKI SEIJI [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0060] , [0001] , [0014] , [0016] , [0050] , [0056] , [0067]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]JP2008114760 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 10 * figure 5 *; | [Y]JP2010000330 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 12,13* figure 1 *; | [XYI]JP2016165379 (NORITZ CORP) [X] 1-3,9,15 * figures 1-5 * [Y] 4,5,8,10-13 [I] 6,7,14; | [Y]CN208598008U (SHANGHAI NALINKE NEW MATERIAL TECH CO LTD) [Y] 4 * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JPS3626752Y [Y] 29-30,39 * 5-7,1-3 *; | JPS54113696U [ ]; | [Y]JPS5528136Y [Y] 6-39 * 2 6-28, *; | JPS5745365U [ ]; | [Y]JP3013638U [Y] 3-39 * [0029]-[0030], 4 *; | [Y]JP2001146585 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 13-39 * [0011]-[0021] *; | [Y]JP2002078587 (TECHNO WORKS KK) [Y] 3-39 * [0007]-[0017], 1-2 *; | [Y]JP2008114760 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 22-39 * [0033]-[0043], 5 *; | [Y]JP2010000330 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 31-39 * [0019], [0052], 1 *; | [XY]KR20120111666 (KOAS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * [0028]-[0072], 2-4 [0028]-[0072], 2-4 * [Y] 3-39; | [XY]JP2016165379 (NORITZ CORP) [X] 1-3,11,13,17 * [0013]-[0036], 1-4 [0013]-[0036], 1-4 * [Y] 3-39 | by applicant | JP2001146585 | JP2010000330 |