EP3996846 - MICROFLUIDIC REACTION VESSEL ARRAY WITH PATTERNED FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kryptos Biotechnologies, Inc. 3423 Investment Blvd. Suite 6 Hayward CA 94545 / US | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SON, Jun, Ho c/o Kryptos Biotechnologies, Inc. 3423 Investment Blvd. Hayward, CA 94545 / US | 02 /
BOUSSE, Luc c/o Kryptos Biotechnologies, Inc. 3423 Investment Blvd. Hayward, CA 94545 / US | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20837765.5 | 08.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020US41278 | Priority number, date | US201962872168P | 09.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962872168 P | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021007368 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3996846 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B67D1/00, F16K21/12, G01N1/14, G01N1/24, B01L7/00 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
B01L7/52 (EP,US);
B01L7/525 (EP);
B01L7/54 (EP);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0829 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | B01L3/00, B67D1/00, F16K21/12, G01N1/14, G01N1/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHE REAKTIONSGEFÄSSANORDNUNG MIT STRUKTURIERTEN FILMEN | [2022/19] | English: | MICROFLUIDIC REACTION VESSEL ARRAY WITH PATTERNED FILMS | [2022/19] | French: | RÉSEAU DE RÉCIPIENTS À RÉACTION MICROFLUIDIQUE À FILMS À MOTIFS | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 19.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2011053151 (HANSEN CARL LARS GENGHIS [CA], et al); | [Y]US2019032114 (TRIVEDI KRUTARTH [US]) | International search | [A]US2011079094 (GRANSEE RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 1-3* , para [0003]-[0073] *; | [A]US2013171679 (LEE PHILIP J [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * , para [0017]-[0098] *; | [A]US2015290669 (LI WEI [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * , para [0003]-[0135] *; | [A]US2016144362 (LEE LUKE P [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * , para [0019]-[0146] *; | [X]US2018297028 (LEE LUKE P [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * , Fig. 3C; para [0017], [0051], [0054], [0061], [0078]-[0083] * | by applicant | US2011053151 | US2019032114 |