EP3997411 - SOLAR POWERED CAP ASSEMBLY FOR OPTICAL SIGHTING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primary Arms, LLC C/o The Compton Law Firm, P.C. 6363 Woodway, Suite 820 Houston, TX 77057 / US | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEETS Jr., Robert, E C/o The Compton Law Firm, P.C. 6363 Woodway, Suite 820 Houston, TX 77057 / US | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/19] | Poskett, Oliver James, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | Application number, filing date | 20837877.8 | 09.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020US41438 | Priority number, date | US201962872487P | 10.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962872487 P | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021007451 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3997411 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F41G1/35, G02B27/34, H02J7/35, // F41G1/34, F41G1/38, H02J7/34 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
G02B27/34 (EP,US);
F41G11/00 (US);
F41G1/345 (US);
F41G1/35 (EP);
H02J7/35 (EP,US);
H02S40/38 (US);
F41G1/34 (EP);
F41G1/38 (EP);
H02J7/345 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | F41G1/34, F41G1/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | SOLARBETRIEBENE KAPPENANORDNUNG FÜR OPTISCHE VISIERSYSTEME | [2022/19] | English: | SOLAR POWERED CAP ASSEMBLY FOR OPTICAL SIGHTING SYSTEMS | [2022/19] | French: | ENSEMBLE CAPUCHON SOLAIRE DE SYSTÈMES DE VISÉE OPTIQUE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 30.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012151816 (KLECK JEFFREY [US], et al); | [A]US2014237884 (KOESLER PAUL D [US], et al); | [Y]US2014360581 (NINOMIYA NAOYA [JP], et al); | [XY]US2018010887 (VANBECELAERE JACOB C [US]) | International search | [Y]US6505952 (KISH PAUL A [US], et al); | [A]US2010220309 (ZHU JIE [CN], et al); | [Y]US2012151816 (KLECK JEFFREY [US], et al); | [A]US2013253820 (DENK ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US2014237884 (KOESLER PAUL D [US], et al); | [Y]US2014360581 (NINOMIYA NAOYA [JP], et al); | [XY]US2018010887 (VANBECELAERE JACOB C [US]) | by applicant | US2018010887 | US9982965 |