EP4085018 - METHOD FOR MOVING AN ELEVATOR CAR OF AN ELEVATOR IN ORDER TO EVACUATE PASSENGERS, AND BRAKE OPENING DEVICE FOR MOVING AN ELEVATOR CAR OF AN ELEVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEWERSDORF, Steffen Zimmelstrasse 37a 6314 Unterägeri / CH | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 20838100.4 | 23.12.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020EP87819 | Priority number, date | EP20190220186 | 31.12.2019 Original published format: EP 19220186 | [2022/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021136738 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085018 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/02 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
B66B5/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEWEGEN EINER AUFZUGSKABINE EINES AUFZUGS ZUM EVAKUIEREN VON PASSAGIEREN UND BREMSÖFFNUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUM BEWEGEN EINER AUFZUGSKABINE EINES AUFZUGS | [2022/45] | English: | METHOD FOR MOVING AN ELEVATOR CAR OF AN ELEVATOR IN ORDER TO EVACUATE PASSENGERS, AND BRAKE OPENING DEVICE FOR MOVING AN ELEVATOR CAR OF AN ELEVATOR | [2022/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE DÉPLACER UNE CABINE D'ASCENSEUR D'UN ASCENSEUR POUR ÉVACUER DES PASSAGERS ET DISPOSITIF D'OUVERTURE DE FREIN PERMETTANT DE DÉPLACER UNE CABINE D'ASCENSEUR D'UN ASCENSEUR | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 18.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN101282899 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [X]JP2011195270 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR CO LTD) | by applicant | WO2007094777 | EP3216735 |