EP4077362 - TREATMENT OF CHRONIC PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UCL Business Ltd University College London Gower Street London WC1E 6BT / GB | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COX, James 61B Ely Road Little Downham Ely Cambridgeshire CB6 2SN / GB | 02 /
WOOD, John c/o UCL Business Ltd The Nework Building 97 Tottenham Court Road London Greater London W1T4TP / GB | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20838222.6 | 18.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020GB53296 | Priority number, date | GB20190018879 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: GB 201918879 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021123814 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4077362 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C12N15/85, C12N15/861 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP);
A61K48/0058 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (US);
C12N15/102 (EP);
C12N15/11 (US);
C12N15/86 (EP);
C12N9/22 (US);
A01K2227/105 (EP);
A01K2267/0356 (EP);
A61K48/005 (EP);
A61K48/0075 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON CHRONISCHEN SCHMERZEN | [2022/43] | English: | TREATMENT OF CHRONIC PAIN | [2022/43] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'UNE DOULEUR CHRONIQUE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 08.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2016057800 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [I] 1-25 * claims 1-6 * * example - * * figures 1, 2, 8-10 *; | [I]WO2017049252 (SWITCH BIO INC [US]) [I] 1-25 * claim - *; | [A]WO2017220800 (UNIV DE VERSAILLES-ST QUENTIN EN YVELINES [FR], et al) [A] 1-25 * page 11, line 15 - line 26 *; | [I]WO2019014615 (UNIV MIAMI [US]) [I] 1-25 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]WO2019222329 (VOYAGER THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-25; | [A] - VETTER IRINA ET AL, "NaV1.7 as a pain target - From gene to pharmacology", PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, (20161202), vol. 172, doi:10.1016/J.PHARMTHERA.2016.11.015, ISSN 0163-7258, pages 73 - 100, XP029939866 [A] 1-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pharmthera.2016.11.015 | [A] - JENNIFER KOENIG ET AL, "Regulation of Na v 1.7: A Conserved SCN9A Natural Antisense Transcript Expressed in Dorsal Root Ganglia", PLOS ONE, (20150602), vol. 10, no. 6, page e0128830, XP055674983 [A] 1-25 | [A] - JOANNE LAU ET AL, "Temporal control of gene deletion in sensory ganglia using a tamoxifen-inducible Advillin-Cre-ERT2 recombinase mouse", MOLECULAR PAIN, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20111221), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1744-8069-7-100, ISSN 1744-8069, page 100, XP021093931 [A] 1-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1744-8069-7-100 | by applicant | - ELBASHIR et al., Nature, (20010000), vol. 411, pages 494 - 498 | - ELBASHIR et al., EMBO J, (20010000), vol. 20, pages 6877 - 6888 | - REYNOLDS et al., Nature Biotech., (20040000), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 326 - 330 | - USMAN et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19870000), vol. 109, page 7845 | - SCARINGE et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19900000), vol. 18, page 5433 | - WINCOTT et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19950000), vol. 23, pages 2677 - 2684 | - WINCOTT et al., Methods Mol. Bio., (19970000), vol. 74, page 59 | - KONERMANN et al., "Genome-scale transcriptional activation by an engineered CRISPR-Cas9 complex", Nature, (20140000), vol. 000, no. 7536, doi:10.1038/nature14136, pages 583 - 8, XP055294959 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature14136 | - ALTSCHUL S. F., J Mol Evol, (19930000), vol. 36, pages 290 - 300 | - ALTSCHUL, S, F et al., J Mol Biol, (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | - HENIKOFF, S.HENIKOFF, J.G., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919 | - KARLIN, S.ALTSCHUL, S.F., "Applications and statistics for multiple high-scoring segments in molecular sequences", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5787 | - DEVEREUX et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19840000), vol. 12, pages 387 - 395 | - CHOI et al., Curr Gene Ther, (20050000), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 299 - 310 | - WU et al., Molecular Therapy, (20060000), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 316 - 327 | - COURANARDI, Virology Journal, (20070000), vol. 4, page 99 | - ALTSCHUL S. F., "A protein alignment scoring system sensitive at all evolutionary distances", J. Mol. Evol., (19930000), vol. 36, doi:10.1007/BF00160485, pages 290 - 300, XP008057491 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00160485 | - ALTSCHUL, S. F. et al., "Basic local alignment search tool", J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, doi:10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999, pages 403 - 410, XP002949123 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999 | - AYUSO E. et al., "High AAV vector purity results in serotype- and tissue-independent enhancement of transduction efficiency", Gene Ther, (20100000), vol. 17, doi:10.1038/gt.2009.157, pages 503 - 510, XP055073587 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2009.157 | - CHAPLAN, S.R.BACH, F.W.POGREL, J.W.CHUNG, J.M.YAKSH, T.L., "Quantitative assessment of tactile allodynia in the rat paw", J Neurosci Methods, (19940000), vol. 53, doi:10.1016/0165-0270(94)90144-9, pages 55 - 63, XP024352718 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-0270(94)90144-9 | - CHOI, J.S. et al., "Paroxysmal extreme pain disorder: a molecular lesion of peripheral neurons", Nat Rev Neurol, (20110000), vol. 7, pages 51 - 5 | - COURA RDOS S.NARDI, N. B., "The state of the art of adeno-associated virus-based vectors in gene therapy", Virol. J., (20070000), vol. 4, page 99, XP021038308 | - DEVEREUX, J. et al., "A comprehensive set of sequence analysis programmes for the VAX", Nucl. Acids Res., (19840000), vol. 12, pages 387 - 395 | - DIB-HAJJ, S.D.WAXMAN, S.G., "Sodium Channels in Human Pain Disorders: Genetics and Pharmacogenomics", Annu Rev Neurosci, (20190000), vol. 42, pages 87 - 106 | - DONG, J. Y. et al., "Quantitative analysis of the packaging capacity of recombinant adeno-associated virus", Hum. Gene Ther., (19960000), vol. 7, pages 2101 - 2112, XP000985472 | - EMERY, E.C. et al., "In vivo characterization of distinct modality-specific subsets of somatosensory neurons using GCaMP", Sci Adv, (20160000), vol. 2, page e1600990 | - ERLES, K.SEBOKOVA, P.SCHLEHOFER, J. R., "Update on the prevalence of serum antibodies (IgG and IgM) to adeno-associated virus (AAV", JMed. Virol., (19990000), vol. 59, pages 406 - 411 | - FALK, S.ULDALL, M.APPEL, C.DING, M.HEEGAARD, A.M., "Influence of sex differences on the progression of cancer-induced bone pain", Anticancer Res, (20130000), vol. 33, pages 1963 - 9 | - GADOTTI, V.M. et al., "Contribution of spinal glutamatergic receptors to the antinociception caused by agmatine in mice", Brain Res, (20060000), vol. 1093, doi:10.1016/j.brainres.2006.03.087, pages 116 - 22, XP025065190 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.brainres.2006.03.087 | - HAEUSSLER, M. et al., "Evaluation of off-target and on-target scoring algorithms and integration into the guide RNA selection tool CRISPOR", Genome Biol, (20160000), vol. 17, doi:10.1186/s13059-016-1012-2, page 148, XP055551329 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13059-016-1012-2 | - HARGREAVES, K.DUBNER, R.BROWN, F.FLORES, C.JORIS, J., "A new and sensitive method for measuring thermal nociception in cutaneous hyperalgesia", Pain, (19880000), vol. 32, doi:10.1016/0304-3959(88)90026-7, pages 77 - 88, XP024378083 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3959(88)90026-7 | - HERMONAT, P. L. et al., "Genetics of adeno-associated virus: isolation and preliminary characterization of adeno-associated virus type 2 mutants", J. Virol., (19840000), vol. 51, pages 329 - 339, XP055213698 | - JOUNGSANDER, "TALENs: a widely applicable technology for targeted genome editing", Nat Rev Mol Cell Biol, vol. 1, pages 49 - 55 | - KOTIN, R. M. et al., "Site-specific integration by adeno-associated virus", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci U. S.A, (19900000), vol. 87, doi:10.1073/pnas.87.6.2211, pages 2211 - 2215, XP002027463 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.87.6.2211 | - KUSCUE C. et al., "CRISPR-STOP: gene silencing through base-editing-induced nonsense mutations", Nature, (20170000), vol. 14, doi:10.1038/nmeth.4327, pages 710 - 712, XP055595359 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.4327 | - LUIZ, A.P. et al., "Antinociceptive action of ethanolic extract obtained from roots of Humirianthera ampla Miers", J Ethnopharmacol, (20070000), vol. 114, pages 355 - 63, XP022326504 | - MAGNUS C. J. et al., "Ultrapotent chemogenetics for research and potential clinical applications", Science, (20190000), vol. 364, page eaav5282 | - MICHELFELDER, S.TREPEL, M., "Adeno-associated viral vectors and their redirection to cell-type specific receptors", Adv. Genet., (20090000), vol. 67, pages 29 - 60, XP009137628 | - MINETT, M.S.QUICK, K.WOOD, J.N., "Behavioral Measures of Pain Thresholds", Curr Protoc Mouse Biol, (20110000), vol. 1, pages 383 - 412 | - MINETT, M.S. et al., "Pain without nociceptors? Navl.7-independent pain mechanisms", Cell Rep, (20140000), vol. 6, pages 301 - 12 | - MOSKALENKO, M. et al., "Epitope mapping of human anti-adeno-associated virus type 2 neutralizing antibodies: implications for gene therapy and virus structure", J. Virol., (20000000), vol. 74, doi:10.1128/JVI.74.4.1761-1766.2000, pages 1761 - 1766, XP002280792 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.74.4.1761-1766.2000 | - RAN, F.A. et al., "In vivo genome editing using Staphylococcus aureus Cas9", Nature, (20150000), vol. 520, doi:10.1038/nature14299, pages 186 - 91, XP055484527 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature14299 | - RANDALL, L.O.SELITTO, J.J., "A method for measurement of analgesic activity on inflamed tissue", Arch Int Pharmacodyn Ther, (19570000), vol. 111, pages 409 - 19 | - SCHEIDT, C. et al., "Evidence for the involvement of glutamatergic receptors in the antinociception caused in mice by the sesquiterpene drimanial", Neuropharmacology, (20020000), vol. 43, pages 340 - 7 | - STIRLING, L.C. et al., "Nociceptor-specific gene deletion using heterozygous NaV1.8-Cre recombinase mice", Pain, (20050000), vol. 113, doi:10.1016/j.pain.2004.08.015, pages 27 - 36, XP004696858 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pain.2004.08.015 | - SUMMERFORD, C.SAMULSKI, R. J., "Membrane-associated heparan sulfate proteoglycan is a receptor for adeno-associated virus type 2 virions", J. Virol., (19980000), vol. 72, pages 1438 - 1445 | - SUN, J. Y. et al., Immune responses to adeno-associated virus and its recombinant vectors, (20030000), vol. 10, pages 964 - 976 | - TABEBORDBAR, M. et al., "In vivo gene editing in dystrophic mouse muscle and muscle stem cells", Science, (20160000), vol. 351, doi:10.1126/science.aad5177, pages 407 - 411, XP055676162 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.aad5177 | - THAKORE, P.I. et al., "RNA-guided transcriptional silencing in vivo with S. aureus CRISPR-Cas9 repressors", Nat Commun, (20180000), vol. 9, doi:10.1038/s41467-018-04048-4, page 1674, XP055624179 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41467-018-04048-4 | - THOMAS, C. E. et al., "Rapid uncoating of vector genomes is the key to efficient liver transduction with pseudotyped adeno-associated virus vectors", J. Virol., (20040000), vol. 78, doi:10.1128/JVI.78.6.3110-3122.2004, pages 3110 - 3122, XP002312778 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.78.6.3110-3122.2004 | - VINCENT-LACAZE, N. et al., "Structure of adeno-associated virus vector DNA following transduction of the skeletal muscle", J Virol, (19990000), vol. 73, pages 1949 - 1955, XP002994873 | - WU, Z. et al., "Adeno-associated virus serotypes: vector toolkit for human gene therapy", Mol. Ther., (20060000), vol. 14, doi:10.1016/j.ymthe.2006.05.009, pages 316 - 327, XP005844824 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymthe.2006.05.009 | - ZAISS, A. K.MURUVE, D. A., "Immunity to adeno-associated virus vectors in animals and humans: a continued challenge", Gene Ther, (20080000), vol. 15, doi:10.1038/gt.2008.54, pages 808 - 816, XP055537842 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2008.54 |