EP4078635 - INTEGRATED POLYMER MATERIALS FOR USE IN ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Superdielectrics Supercap Ltd The Mansion Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Cambridge CB10 1XL / GB | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGHGATE, Donald James The Mansion Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden, Cambridge CB10 1XL / GB | 02 /
HOWLIN, Brendan James The Mansion Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden, Cambridge CB10 1XL / GB | 03 /
TANG, Winnie The Mansion Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden, Cambridge CB10 1XL / GB | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 20838229.1 | 18.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020GB53305 | Priority number, date | GB20190018896 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: GB 201918896 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021123823 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4078635 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01G11/56, H01M10/0565 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
H01G11/84 (EP,US);
H01G11/56 (EP,GB,US);
C08K7/06 (US);
H01G11/64 (GB);
H01G9/028 (GB);
C08K2201/001 (US);
Y02E60/13 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE POLYMERMATERIALIEN FÜR ELEKTROCHEMISCHE ZELLEN | [2022/43] | English: | INTEGRATED POLYMER MATERIALS FOR USE IN ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS | [2022/43] | French: | MATÉRIAUX POLYMÈRES INTÉGRÉS DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS DANS DES CELLULES ÉLECTROCHIMIQUES | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 13.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2012304599 (HO WEN-HSIEN [TW], et al); | [X]CN106653391 (UNIV GUANGDONG TECHNOLOGY) | by applicant | WO2017115064 | WO2017153705 | WO2017153706 |