EP4077770 - ELECTROPLATING COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR DEPOSITING A CHROMIUM COATING ON A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atotech Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [2024/02] |
Former [2022/43] | For all designated states Atotech Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPE, Simon c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Intellectual Property Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | 02 /
BREITFELDER, Jana c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Intellectual Property Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | 03 /
WALTER, Anke c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Intellectual Property Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | MKS IP Association Intellectual Property Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | Atotech Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 20838402.4 | 17.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP86688 | Priority number, date | EP20190217662 | 18.12.2019 Original published format: EP 19217662 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021122932 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4077770 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/06, C25D3/10 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
C25D3/06 (EP,KR,US);
C25D3/10 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | GALVANISIERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABSCHEIDEN EINER CHROMBESCHICHTUNG AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT | [2022/43] | English: | ELECTROPLATING COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR DEPOSITING A CHROMIUM COATING ON A SUBSTRATE | [2022/43] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ÉLECTROPLACAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPÔT D'UN REVÊTEMENT DE CHROME SUR UN SUBSTRAT | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 04.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0100133 (M & T CHEMICALS INC [US]) [X] 1,3,7,10,11,14 * page 4, lines 5-25; example 14 *; | [XYI]CN105063676 (INNER MONGOLIA 1ST MACH GROUP, et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-12,14 * examples 1, 2 * [Y] 9 [I] 4,13; | [X]US2016068983 (SCHULZ KLAUS-DIETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,10,11,14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0102] *; | [Y]EP3150743 (ROHM & HAAS ELECT MAT [US]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0001] ** paragraph [0021] *; | [X]CN108034969 (UNIV MINNAN NORMAL, et al) [X] 1,8,10,11,14,15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0027] *; | [X]US2018245227 (ABBOTT ANDREW PETER [GB], et al) [X] 1,10-12,14,15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0054] * | by applicant | US2748069 | US3432408 | US4009085 | EP0100133 | WO2015110627 | US2016068983 | CN108034969 | US2018245227 | WO2018185154 |