EP4076679 - COSMETIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE POLAR OIL, AN ALIPHATIC MONOALCOHOL, A MIXTURE OF POLYOLS AND AT LEAST ONE HYDROPHILIC ACTIVE AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'OREAL 14 rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [2023/15] |
Former [2022/43] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAHLER, Arno L'Oréal R&I CHEVILLY 188, rue Paul Hochart BP553 94152 CHEVILLY LA RUE / FR | 02 /
ISOIR-INGREZ, Muriel L'OREAL R&I CHEVILLY 188, rue Paul Hochart BP553 94152 CHEVILLY LA RUE / FR | 03 /
GUILBAUD, Sophie SANOFLORE Route de Lozeron par Beaufort 26400 GIGORS ET LOZERON / FR | 04 /
PAGE, Valérie SANOFLORE Route de Lozeron par Beaufort 26400 GIGORS ET LOZERON / FR | 05 /
FOURON, Jean-Yves L'OREAL R&I CHEVILLY 188, rue Paul Hochart BP553 94152 CHEVILLY LA RUE / FR | 06 /
WANG, Pamella L'OREAL R&I CHEVILLY 188, rue Paul Hochart BP553 94152 CHEVILLY LA RUE / FR | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20838443.8 | 18.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP87027 | Priority number, date | FR20190015200 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1915200 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021123170 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4076679 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/00, A61K8/34, A61K8/60, A61K8/92 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61K8/92 (US);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61K8/342 (EP);
A61K8/345 (EP);
A61K8/361 (US);
A61K8/60 (EP);
A61K8/922 (EP);
A61Q5/002 (US);
A61K2800/31 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT MINDESTENS EINEM POLAREN ÖL, EINEM ALIPHATISCHEN MONOALKOHOL, EIN GEMISCH AUS POLYOLEN UND MINDESTENS EINEM HYDROPHILEN WIRKSTOFF | [2022/43] | English: | COSMETIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE POLAR OIL, AN ALIPHATIC MONOALCOHOL, A MIXTURE OF POLYOLS AND AT LEAST ONE HYDROPHILIC ACTIVE AGENT | [2022/43] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UNE HUILE POLAIRE, UN MONOALCOOL ALIPHATIQUE, UN MÉLANGE DE POLYOLS ET AU MOINS UN PRINCIPE ACTIF HYDROPHILE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 20.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9719674 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 3, paragraph 6 - paragraph 8 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * claims 1+-3 *; | [YD]WO02051828 (OREAL [FR], et al) [YD] 1-14 * page 1, line 4 - line 20 * * page 7, line 18 - page 28 * * page 19, line 14 - line 29 * * page 24, line 22 - page 34, line 2 * * example - * * claim - *; | [Y]WO2004016289 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 5, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4 * * example - * * claim - *; | [A]WO2013106999 (OREAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * example - *; | [Y]FR3015246 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, line 9 - line 14 * * page 2, line 41 - page 3, line 8 * * page 5, line 17 - page 7, line 28 * * page 15, line 21 - page 29, line 16 * * example - * * claim - *; | [A]WO2018114850 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 4 - line 21 * * page 2, line 4 - line 11 * * page 5, line 19 - line 28 * * page 6, line 17 - page 14, line 2 * * page 16, line 6 - page 22, line 20 * * example - * * claim - *; | [A]FR3075052 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 3, line 26 - page 8, line 14 ** example - * | by applicant | WO02051828 | WO2008155059 | - C. M. HANSEN, "The three dimensional solubility parameters", J. Paint Technol., (19670000), vol. 39, page 105 | FR20030002809 |