EP4076065 - VAPORIZER UNIT, VAPORIZER ASSEMBLY AS WELL AS VAPORIZER CARTRIDGE FOR AN INHALER, INHALER WITH SUCH A VAPORIZER CARTRIDGE AS WELL AS METHOD FOR PRODUCING VAPORIZER UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Körber Technologies GmbH Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | [2022/52] |
Former [2022/43] | For all designated states Hauni Maschinenbau GmbH Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORNILS, Lasse Elbchaussee 204 H15 22605 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
HANNEKEN, Christian Sierichstraße 160 22299 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
KÄTHNER, Svenja Eppendorfer Weg 120 20259 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
KLEINE WÄCHTER, Michael Steindamm 6 23881 Lankau / DE | 05 /
ROMMING, Niklas 24306 Plön / DE | 06 /
SCHUSTER, Christof Gravensteiner Straße 7 20259 Hamburg / DE | 07 /
ROSENBOHM, Arne Birkenweg 35 21720 Steinkirchen / DE | 08 /
NIEBUHR, Gunnar Forsthöhe 18 21149 Hamburg / DE | 09 /
SCHMIDT, Rene Am Kattenberge 71b 21244 Buchholz i.d.N. / DE | 10 /
PANKOKE, Finn Oliver Reuterstraße 77 25436 Uetersen / DE | 11 /
LEICHSENRING, Dennis Königstraße 1 22767 Hamburg / DE | 12 /
JAKLIN, Jan Meißner Straße 60 70736 Fellbach / DE | 13 /
BERGMANN, Max Gertigstraße 17 22303 Hamburg / DE | [2023/43] |
Former [2022/43] | 01 /
CORNILS, Lasse Elbchaussee 204 H15 22605 Hamburg / DE | ||
02 /
HANNEKEN, Christian Sierichstraße 160 22299 Hamburg / DE | |||
03 /
KÄTHNER, Svenja Eppendorfer Weg 120 20259 Hamburg / DE | |||
04 /
KLEINE WÄCHTER, Michael Steindamm 6 23881 Lankau / DE | |||
05 /
ROMMING, Niklas Heinrich-Hertz-Straße 21 22085 Hamburg / DE | |||
06 /
SCHUSTER, Christof Gravensteiner Straße 7 20259 Hamburg / DE | |||
07 /
ROSENBOHM, Arne Birkenweg 35 21720 Steinkirchen / DE | |||
08 /
NIEBUHR, Gunnar Forsthöhe 18 21149 Hamburg / DE | |||
09 /
SCHMIDT, Rene Am Kattenberge 71b 21244 Buchholz i.d.N. / DE | |||
10 /
PANKOKE, Finn Oliver Reuterstraße 77 25436 Uetersen / DE | |||
11 /
LEICHSENRING, Dennis Königstraße 1 22767 Hamburg / DE | |||
12 /
JAKLIN, Jan Meißner Straße 60 70736 Fellbach / DE | |||
13 /
BERGMANN, Max Gertigstraße 17 22303 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | Stork Bamberger Patentanwälte PartmbB Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20839272.0 | 17.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP86694 | Priority number, date | DE201910135177 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019135177 | [2022/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021122936 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4076065 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4076065 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/46, A24F40/70 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
A24F40/46 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/42 (KR);
A24F40/44 (KR);
A24F40/465 (KR);
A24F40/50 (KR);
A24F40/53 (KR,US);
A24F40/65 (KR,US);
A24F40/70 (EP,KR,US);
A61M15/0001 (KR);
A61M15/06 (KR);
H05B3/0019 (KR);
H05B6/72 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | VERDAMPFEREINHEIT, VERDAMPFERBAUGRUPPE SOWIE VERDAMPFERKARTUSCHE FÜR EINEN INHALATOR, INHALATOR MIT EINER SOLCHEN VERDAMPFERKARTUSCHE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERDAMPFEREINHEITEN | [2023/43] | English: | VAPORIZER UNIT, VAPORIZER ASSEMBLY AS WELL AS VAPORIZER CARTRIDGE FOR AN INHALER, INHALER WITH SUCH A VAPORIZER CARTRIDGE AS WELL AS METHOD FOR PRODUCING VAPORIZER UNITS | [2022/43] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE VAPORISATION, MODULE DE VAPORISATION ET CARTOUCHE DE VAPORISATION POUR INHALATEUR, INHALATEUR DOTÉ D'UNE TELLE CARTOUCHE DE VAPORISATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ENSEMBLES DE VAPORISATION | [2022/43] |
Former [2022/43] | VERDAMPFEREINHEIT, VERDAMPFERBAUGRUPPE SOWIE VERDAMPFERKARTUSCHE FÜR EINEN INHALATOR, INHALATOR MIT EINER SOLCHEN VERDAMPFERKARTUSCHE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERDAMPFEREINHEITEN | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 15.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | MC | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | IT | 17.12.2023 | LU | 17.12.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SK | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
IT | 17.12.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2018116285 (POLLONI ROBERTO [IT], et al) [A] 1,24* paragraphs [0048] - [0050]; figures 5,6 *; | [A]WO2018219584 (HERAEUS SENSOR TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-34 * page 1, lines 6-9 * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 7 * * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 23 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102017130501 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-34 * paragraphs [0042] - [0055]; figure - *; | [A]WO2019127643 (SHENZHEN HUACHENGDA PREC INDUSTRY CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1,24 * abstract *; | [A]DE102018105220 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,24 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0063] - [0077] * |