EP4078330 - DEVICE COMPONENT HAVING A MAGNETORHEOLOGICAL BRAKE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVENTUS Engineering GmbH Montafonerstraße 68 6771 St. Anton i.M. / AT | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATTLOGG, Stefan Nummer 166 6771 St. Anton i.M. / AT | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | BSB Patentanwälte Schütte & Engelen Partnerschaft mbB Am Markt 10 59302 Oelde / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20839294.4 | 18.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP87179 | Priority number, date | DE201910135026 | 18.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019135026 | [2022/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021123278 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4078330 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05G5/03, F16F9/53, G05G1/08 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
G05G5/03 (EP,US);
F16F9/535 (EP,US);
F16F9/006 (US);
F16F2222/06 (US);
F16F2230/08 (US);
G01R33/0076 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | GERÄTEKOMPONENTE MIT EINER MAGNETORHEOLOGISCHEN BREMSEINRICHTUNG | [2022/43] | English: | DEVICE COMPONENT HAVING A MAGNETORHEOLOGICAL BRAKE DEVICE | [2022/43] | French: | COMPOSANT D'APPAREIL POURVU D'UN DISPOSITIF DE FREINAGE MAGNÉTORHÉOLOGIQUE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 14.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP1168622 (PHILIPS CORP INTELLECTUAL PTY [DE], et al) [Y] 15-19 * figure 2 * [A] 1; | [A]WO2010020422 (INVENTUS ENGINEERING GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1-26* figures 2-4 *; | [XAY]DE102015104927 (INVENTUS ENG GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,2,9-13,20-25 * paragraph [0095]; figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0100] * [A] 6,8,14 [Y] 3-5,7,15-19; | [XAY]DE102018100390 (INVENTUS ENG GMBH [AT]) [X] 26 * paragraph [0041]; figures 1, 3-10 * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0049] * [A] 1,2,6,8-25 [Y] 3-5,7 | by applicant | WO2012034697 | WO2017001697 | WO2018215350 | WO2019138015 |