EP4094009 - METHOD FOR OPENING A VALVE ASSEMBLY FOR A FUEL TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEMMER, Helerson Enzhaldenweg 13 71665 Vaihingen / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 20839319.9 | 23.12.2020 | [2022/48] | WO2020EP87749 | Priority number, date | DE202010200679 | 22.01.2020 Original published format: DE102020200679 | [2022/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021148220 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4094009 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/02 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
F17C13/12 (EP);
F17C13/123 (EP,KR,US);
F17C13/04 (KR,US);
F16K31/0675 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2205/0323 (EP);
F17C2205/0326 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2205/0332 (KR,US);
F17C2221/012 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2223/036 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2250/032 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2260/042 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2260/046 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2270/0178 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2270/0184 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/32 (EP,KR);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ÖFFNEN EINER VENTILANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN TREIBSTOFFTANK | [2022/48] | English: | METHOD FOR OPENING A VALVE ASSEMBLY FOR A FUEL TANK | [2022/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OUVERTURE D'UN ENSEMBLE DE SOUPAPES POUR UN RÉSERVOIR DE COMBUSTIBLE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 22.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/33] | 31.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003010325 (REISCHL ROLF [DE], et al); | [Y]DE102009060028 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [YA]EP2653763 (HYPTEC GMBH [AT]); | [Y]DE102014014526 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [A]US2016208724 (MELIS MASSIMILIANO [IT], et al); | [A]DE102015212739 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE102016202185 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [Y]DE102016008035 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [Y]US2018209588 (HANADA TOMOYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2019170260 (HAUSMANN PHILIPP [DE]); | [Y]US2019249779 (ALBERT SIMONE [DE], et al); | [XYI]US2019323447 (INABA MASASHI [JP], et al); | [A]GB2574229 (FAS MEDIC SA [CH]) |