EP4000302 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING SIDELINK RETRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEO, Hanbyul IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Youngdae IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
THOMAS, Robin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20840153.9 | 15.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020KR09306 | Priority number, date | KR20190086515 | 17.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190086515 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021010742 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000302 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/04, H04W28/02, H04W24/10, H04L1/18, H04W4/40, H04L1/1867 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H04L1/1825 (EP);
H04W4/40 (EP,CN);
H04L1/08 (US);
H04B17/318 (US);
H04L1/1657 (EP);
H04L1/1812 (CN,US);
H04L1/189 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04W28/04 (CN);
H04W4/70 (CN);
H04L2001/0093 (EP);
H04W28/0226 (EP);
H04W92/18 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/21] | H04W28/04, H04W28/02, H04W24/10, H04L1/18, H04W4/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER SIDELINK-RÜCKÜBERTRAGUNG | [2022/21] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING SIDELINK RETRANSMISSION | [2022/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR EFFECTUER UNE RETRANSMISSION DE LIAISON LATÉRALE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 04.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2017215183 (GULATI KAPIL [US], et al); |