EP4000392 - PRODUCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Niterra Co., Ltd. 1-1-1, Higashisakura Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 461-0005 / JP | [2023/33] |
Former [2022/21] | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEHIRO, Yoji c/o NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Miyuki c/o NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP | 03 /
TAKENOSHITA, Koyo c/o Uhuru Corporation 4th Floor, Hulic Kamiyacho Building 4-3-13, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIDA, Isamu c/o Uhuru Corporation 4th Floor, Hulic Kamiyacho Building 4-3-13, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | 05 /
NISHIMURA, Ryoji c/o Uhuru Corporation 4th Floor, Hulic Kamiyacho Building 4-3-13, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | 06 /
YAMASAKI, Yusuke c/o Uhuru Corporation 4th Floor, Hulic Kamiyacho Building 4-3-13, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20840279.2 | 14.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020JP27384 | Priority number, date | JP20190131051 | 16.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019131051 | [2022/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021010398 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000392 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01K61/00, G05B19/418, A01G7/00, A01K29/00 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
A01K61/00 (EP);
A01G7/00 (US);
A01K29/00 (EP);
G05B19/41865 (US);
G06Q50/02 (US);
Y02A40/81 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | PRODUKTVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/21] | English: | PRODUCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2022/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE PRODUITS AGRICOLES | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2022 | Translation filed | 14.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 25.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017105388 (PFEIFF CARL [SE]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0070] - [0156]; figures 1-2 *; | [XI]US2017245480 (HAKONARSON SVERRIR [IS], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0074] - [0078]; figures 1-2; claims 1, 6, 7, 14-17 *[I] 6 | International search | [A]JPH09149742 (KOBAYASHI SANAE) [A] 1-6 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2000166421 (KOSU KK, et al) [A] 1-6 * entire text, all drawings *; | [Y]JP2001256289 (DAIMATSU SHIGENAO) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0023]-[0030], [0077], fig. 1 *; | [A]JP2003052275 (ERUSON KK) [A] 1-6 * entire text, all drawings *; | [X]JP2006254807 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1, 5-6 * paragraphs [0031]-[0049], fig. 5-8 *; | [Y]JP2017148007 (OKINAWA PREFECTURE) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0043]-[0049], fig. 1 *; | [A]WO2017199927 (OYAMA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6* entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JP2003052275 |