EP4001361 - POLYESTER RESIN BLEND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Chemicals Co., Ltd. 310, Pangyo-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Da-Young 310, Pangyo-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Yoo Jin 310, Pangyo-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20840408.7 | 28.05.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020KR06918 | Priority number, date | KR20190086936 | 18.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190086936 | [2022/21] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021010591 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4001361 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02, C08G63/183, C08G63/42, C08G63/199, C08G63/672 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
C08G63/672 (EP,CN);
C08L67/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G63/183 (EP,KR,US);
C08G63/199 (KR);
C08G63/42 (KR);
C08G63/88 (EP);
C08G2250/00 (US);
C08L2201/10 (CN);
C08L2205/025 (CN,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L67/02 (CN,EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/21] | C08L67/02, C08G63/183, C08G63/42, C08G63/199 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | POLYESTERHARZMISCHUNG | [2022/21] | English: | POLYESTER RESIN BLEND | [2022/21] | French: | MÉLANGE DE RÉSINE DE POLYESTER | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2021 | Translation filed | 29.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 03.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012157636 (NEILL RYAN THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-14 * * Examples *; | [A]WO2013016118 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-20 * * Examples *; | [A]WO2018236111 (SK CHEMICALS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * Claims ** Examples *; | [E]EP3912815 (SK CHEMICALS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1,2,5,7-11,13,14 * Preparation Examples 1-6;; examples 1-17; tables 1-2 * * claims 1-20 * | International search | [A]KR20090106548 [A] 1-14 * [34]; 1-14 *; | [X]KR20140063636 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [X] 1-14 * [0013]-[0024], [0415], [0424], [0445], [0464], [0473]-[0479], [0482]; 1 *; | [A]US2014316037 (KANNAN GANESH [US], et al)[A] 1-14; | [A]KR20150038014 [A] 1-14 * 1, 6-13 *; | [A]KR20170076558 (SK CHEMICALS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * 1-14; 1 * | by applicant | JP4771204B |