EP4002086 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IMAGE SYNTHESIS, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Jie No. 18 Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an. Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Hai No. 18 Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an. Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20840542.3 | 09.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020CN100970 | Priority number, date | CN201910647137 | 17.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910647137 | [2022/21] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021008424 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4002086 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/147, G06F3/14, G06T1/20 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
G09G5/363 (EP);
G09G5/005 (US);
G06F3/1407 (CN);
G06F3/147 (CN);
G06T1/20 (CN,US);
G06T1/60 (US);
G06T11/60 (EP);
G09G5/006 (US);
G09G5/397 (EP);
G06T2200/24 (EP);
G09G2340/10 (EP);
G09G2340/12 (EP);
G09G2360/04 (US);
G09G2360/06 (EP);
G09G2370/08 (US);
G09G2370/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDSYNTHESE, ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/21] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IMAGE SYNTHESIS, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SYNTHÈSE D'IMAGE, APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2022 | Translation filed | 16.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 29.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN106331831 (ZHUHAI MEIZU TECH CO LTD); | [XI]US2017316541 (KIM SEUNG JIN [KR], et al); | [X]US2018189922 (CHINNADURAI SRINIVASAN [IN], et al); |